|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1906 | 15/12/1906 | General | Boiler number 237 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1909 | 20/03/1909 | General | Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1914 | 31/01/1914 | General | Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1919 | 19/04/1919 | General | Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1921 | 13/08/1921 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1923 | 12/04/1924 | 148 days | General | Boiler number 468A (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6053 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1926 | 04/09/1926 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1928 | 24/11/1928 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1931 | 03/10/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 591 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1935 | 19/01/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 595 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/07/1937 | 07/08/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 319 (Diagram 17Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1053 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6252 Allocated to Mexborough (MEX) Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
1906 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1906. Dep: 15/12/1906. Work undertaken: Boiler number 237 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: 20/03/1909. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 31/01/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 19/04/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
18/06/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1921. Dep: 13/08/1921. | ||
17/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1923. Dep: 12/04/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 468A (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6053 |
||
26/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1926. Dep: 04/09/1926. | ||
27/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1928. Dep: 24/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
29/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1931. Dep: 03/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 591 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
12/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1935. Dep: 19/01/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 595 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
24/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
10/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 319 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
11/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
28/02/1939 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 6053 from Barnsley (BRN) |