|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1907 | 11/05/1907 | General | Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1912 | 22/06/1912 | General | Returned to UK 9/7/19 Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 26/07/1919 | 06/09/1919 | 43 days | General | New L.H. cylinder |
||
Gorton Works | 16/04/1921 | 04/06/1921 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1923 | 22/09/1923 | 176 days | General | Boiler number 1646 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1925 | 27/02/1926 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5058 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1928 | 26/01/1929 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 589 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 20/12/1930 | 17/01/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1677 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1933 | 17/06/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1936 | 29/02/1936 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1939 | 11/03/1939 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 22997 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1940 | 1 day | Unclassified | Boiler examination only |
|||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1942 | 1 day | Rebuilding | Tender sent to Gorton 4/4/42 |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 26/03/1945 | 18/04/1945 | 24 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/02/1946 | 09/02/1946 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/02/1946 | 28/02/1946 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/12/1947 | 10/01/1948 | 18 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/01/1951 | 03/03/1951 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 69925 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/03/1951 | 17/03/1951 | 6 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
22/08/1948 | Eastfleld MPD | Class 'Q.1' NO,. 9927 has been re-numbered 69927 and lettered British Railways, but retains the L.N.E.R. totem on the bunker. Another engine of this Class, No. 9925, has been fitted with slip-coupling apparatus since early July and was used on the Cowlairs Bank during the Glasgow Fair Holiday. No. 61103 (THJ) was noted here painted black and fully lined on 28/8 being ex Cowlairs W/E 28/8; a smokebox numberplate had been fitted | SLS/194810 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1903 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 58 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4204 Allocated to Mexborough (MEX) Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
1907 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: 11/05/1907. Work undertaken: Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 22/06/1912. Work undertaken: Returned to UK 9/7/19 Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
26/07/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1919. Dep: 06/09/1919. Work undertaken: New L.H. cylinder |
||
16/04/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1921. Dep: 04/06/1921. | ||
31/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1923. Dep: 22/09/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1646 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
19/05/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
12/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1925. Dep: 27/02/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5058 |
||
04/01/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
01/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1928. Dep: 26/01/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 589 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
28/02/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
20/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1930. Dep: 17/01/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1677 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
27/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1933. Dep: 17/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
28/04/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
22/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1936. Dep: 29/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
04/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22997 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
30/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler examination only |
||
24/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 24/01/1942. Work undertaken: Tender sent to Gorton 4/4/42 |
||
25/06/1942 | Modification | Diagram 17Sup number 22997 boiler fitted | ||
25/06/1942 | Modification | Diagram 17Sup number 916 boiler fitted | ||
11/07/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
09/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
26/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
26/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1945. Dep: 18/04/1945. | ||
05/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/02/1946. Dep: 09/02/1946. | ||
27/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/02/1946. Dep: 28/02/1946. | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9925 | ||
24/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1947. Dep: 10/01/1948. | ||
30/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/01/1951. Dep: 03/03/1951. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69925 |
||
12/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/03/1951. Dep: 17/03/1951. | ||
13/08/1954 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69925 from Eastfield (65A) |