|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1907 | 19/10/1907 | General | Boiler number 845 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1910 | 05/02/1910 | General | Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1915 | 17/07/1915 | General | Boiler number 1410 (Diagram 4Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1920 | 14/08/1920 | General | Boiler number 1373 (Diagram 17Sup) |
|||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1922 | 07/10/1922 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1924 | 15/11/1924 | 155 days | General | New R.H. cylinder Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5064 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/08/1927 | 26/11/1927 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 839 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1930 | 17/05/1930 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1933 | 11/02/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1911 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1935 | 29/06/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1938 | 19/02/1938 | 15 days | General | Secondhand L.H. cylinder Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1940 | 12/10/1940 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1943 | 15/05/1943 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 876 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1947 | 27/12/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3771 (Diagram 17Sat) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1903 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 64 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4206 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted |
||
14/12/1903 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1907 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: 19/10/1907. Work undertaken: Boiler number 845 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 05/02/1910. Work undertaken: Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 17/07/1915. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1410 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 14/08/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1373 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
05/08/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1922. Dep: 07/10/1922. | ||
14/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1924. Dep: 15/11/1924. Work undertaken: New R.H. cylinder Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5064 |
||
15/10/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
15/12/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
13/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1927. Dep: 26/11/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 839 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
12/1928 | Modification | Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge | ||
19/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1930. Dep: 17/05/1930. | ||
05/01/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
28/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1933. Dep: 11/02/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1911 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
15/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1935. Dep: 29/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
28/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
05/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1938. Dep: 19/02/1938. Work undertaken: Secondhand L.H. cylinder Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
31/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1940. Dep: 12/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
04/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 876 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
25/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3205 | ||
06/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1947. Dep: 27/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3771 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
26/12/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3205 from Ardsley (37A) |