|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1907 | 10/1907 | General | ||||
Gorton Works | 1912 | 19/10/1912 | General | Boiler number 1268 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1920 | 10/01/1920 | General | Boiler number 1829 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1921 | 01/04/1922 | 99 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1924 | 12/04/1924 | 57 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5070 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1926 | 26/03/1927 | 120 days | General | Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1929 | 04/05/1929 | 15 days | General | New L.H. cylinder Boiler number 438 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1930 | 29/11/1930 | 36 days | General | New R.H. cylinder |
||
Gorton Works | 15/04/1933 | 29/04/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1829 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1935 | 09/11/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 876 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1937 | 31/12/1937 | 14 days | General | Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1940 | 30/03/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1941 | 10/01/1942 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/09/1943 | 1 day | Rebuilding | Tender sent to Woodford on 6/ll/43 for use as a water carrier |
|||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1946 | 04/05/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3763 (Diagram 17A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9929 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1948 | 02/10/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3739 (Diagram 17A) Renumbered to BR 69929 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1951 | 25/08/1951 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 22986 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1955 | 15/10/1955 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 22989 (Diagram 17A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/01/1959 | Frodingham MPD | Following the extensive use of diesel shunters here, the 5 Q1 0-8-0Ts allocated are now in store (69928/9/34/5/6). | SLS/195903 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1903 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 70 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4210 Allocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
1907 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: ?/10/1907. | ||
07/10/1907 | Modification | Diagram 17Sat number 854 boiler fitted | ||
1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 19/10/1912. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1268 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 10/01/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1829 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
24/12/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1921. Dep: 01/04/1922. | ||
16/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1924. Dep: 12/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5070 |
||
03/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
27/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1926. Dep: 26/03/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
20/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1929. Dep: 04/05/1929. Work undertaken: New L.H. cylinder Boiler number 438 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
08/01/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
25/02/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
25/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1930. Dep: 29/11/1930. Work undertaken: New R.H. cylinder |
||
15/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1933. Dep: 29/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1829 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
26/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1935. Dep: 09/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 876 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
18/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1937. Dep: 31/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
24/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940. | ||
12/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1941. Dep: 10/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
06/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 06/09/1943. Work undertaken: Tender sent to Woodford on 6/ll/43 for use as a water carrier |
||
13/11/1943 | Modification | Diagram 17A number 3744 boiler fitted | ||
19/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
09/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
15/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 3209 but not taken up | ||
30/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3763 (Diagram 17A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9929 |
||
04/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1948. Dep: 02/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3739 (Diagram 17A) Renumbered to BR 69929 |
||
26/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1951. Dep: 25/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22986 (Diagram 17A) |
||
11/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1955. Dep: 15/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22989 (Diagram 17A) |
||
15/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
28/08/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69929 from Frodingham (36C) |