Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 344 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 3697 Week
» 30318 Month
» 30318 Year
» 1695694 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 135 m/e 01/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5135   27/03/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4217
To Service During 01/1904 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Thu 10/06/1937 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 33 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 01/1904
MAR March on 31/01/1927
ARD Ardsley on 04/01/1929
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street on 16/03/1929
ARD Ardsley on 23/04/1934
   Withdrawn on 10/06/1937

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 852)
28/01/1908 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 857)
14/12/1912 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 851)
17/02/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 336)
11/08/1923 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 19)
15/12/1928 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 328)
10/11/1934 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 442)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1908 28/01/1908   General
Boiler number 857 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1912 14/12/1912   General
Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1917 17/02/1917   General
Returned to UK 5/4/19
Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1919 26/07/1919   General  
Gorton Works 12/03/1921 07/05/1921 57 days General  
Gorton Works 28/04/1923 11/08/1923 106 days General
Boiler number 19 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1926 27/03/1926 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5135
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1928 15/12/1928 71 days General
Boiler number 328 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 28/03/1931 02/05/1931 36 days General  
Gorton Works 27/10/1934 10/11/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 442 (Diagram 17Sat)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 135
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4217
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
31/01/1927 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
04/01/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
16/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
23/04/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
10/06/1937 Withdrawn Condemned as 5135 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev