Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 238 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2507 Week
» 21408 Month
» 21408 Year
» 1686784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 139 m/e 02/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5139   24/10/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/102/1904
Q4/2 (0-8-0)24/10/1925
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4221
To Service During 02/1904 to Keadby (KEA)
Withdrawal Sat 18/08/1934 off Frodingham (FRO)
Service Life 30 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KEA Keadby (New) m/e 02/1904
IMM Immingham on 10/01/1930
KEA Keadby on 11/06/1932
FRO Frodingham on 18/06/1932
   Withdrawn on 18/08/1934

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 856)
03/08/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 839)
20/05/1911 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1273)
24/02/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1416)
09/06/1923 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1832)
24/10/1925 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 641)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
27/07/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 336)
28/12/1929 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 915)
19/03/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 918)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1907 03/08/1907   General
Boiler number 839 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1911 20/05/1911   General
Boiler number 1273 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 24/02/1917   General
Returned to UK 10/5/19
Boiler number 1416 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1919 26/07/1919 36 days General  
Gorton Works 18/09/1920 13/11/1920 57 days General  
Gorton Works 17/03/1923 09/06/1923 85 days General
Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1925 24/10/1925 120 days General
Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5139
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1928 14/04/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 22/06/1929 27/07/1929 36 days General
Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1929 28/12/1929 15 days General
Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1932 19/03/1932 15 days General
Not repaired
Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 139
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4221
Allocated to Keadby (KEA)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
10/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
11/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
18/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
18/08/1934 Withdrawn Condemned as 5139 from Frodingham (FRO)    

prev prev