Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 306 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4652 Week
» 4652 Month
» 71514 Year
» 1736890 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 144 m/e 03/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5144   12/12/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4225
To Service During 03/1904 to Immingham (IMM)
Withdrawal Sat 14/05/1938 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 34 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
IMM   Immingham (New) m/e 03/1904
ARD   Ardsley on 11/08/1928
     Withdrawn on 14/05/1938
GOR   Gorton w/e 27/11/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 27/11/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1904 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 860)
31/10/1908 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 865)
29/04/1911 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 856)
28/07/1923 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1696)
30/06/1928 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 522)
03/10/1931 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1817)
15/06/1935 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 19)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 1908 31/10/1908   General Boiler number 865 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1911 29/04/1911   General Boiler number 856 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1916 21/10/1916 183 days General Returned to UK 19/4/19
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1919 12/07/1919 57 days General    
Gorton Works 12/03/1921 16/04/1921 36 days General    
Gorton Works 21/04/1923 28/07/1923 99 days General Boiler number 1696 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1925 12/12/1925 71 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5144
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1928 30/06/1928 29 days General Boiler number 522 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1931 03/10/1931 29 days General Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1935 15/06/1935 15 days General Boiler number 19 (Diagram 17Sat)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 144
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4225
Allocated to Immingham (IMM)
Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted
   
1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: 31/10/1908.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 865 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: 29/04/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 856 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
22/04/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1916. Dep: 21/10/1916.
Work undertaken:
Returned to UK 19/4/19
   
17/05/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1919. Dep: 12/07/1919.    
12/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1921. Dep: 16/04/1921.    
21/04/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1923. Dep: 28/07/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1696 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
03/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1925. Dep: 12/12/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5144
   
02/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1928. Dep: 30/06/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 522 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
11/08/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
05/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1931. Dep: 03/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
01/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1935. Dep: 15/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 19 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
14/05/1938 Withdrawn Condemned as 5144 from Ardsley (ARD)    
27/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    

prev prev