|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1907 | 21/09/1907 | General | Boiler number 856 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1911 | 07/01/1911 | General | Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1916 | 21/11/1916 | General | Boiler number 1650 (Diagram 17Sup) |
|||
Gorton Works | 22/01/1921 | 19/03/1921 | 57 days | General | New R.H. cylinder |
||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1923 | 17/05/1924 | 316 days | General | New L.H. cylinder Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5146 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/11/1925 | 31/12/1925 | 48 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1928 | 03/11/1928 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/12/1930 | 17/01/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 550 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1933 | 13/05/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1935 | 21/12/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22997 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1938 | 07/01/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1842 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/10/1941 | 01/11/1941 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 3730 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/04/1944 | 22/04/1944 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1945 | 22/12/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3722 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1948 | 01/05/1948 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 3735 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to BR 63217 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 146 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4227 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
1907 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: 21/09/1907. Work undertaken: Boiler number 856 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: 07/01/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
21/12/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: 21/11/1916. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1650 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
22/01/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1921. Dep: 19/03/1921. Work undertaken: New R.H. cylinder |
||
07/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1923. Dep: 17/05/1924. Work undertaken: New L.H. cylinder Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5146 |
||
14/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1925. Dep: 31/12/1925. | ||
15/10/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
08/12/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
29/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1928. Dep: 03/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
20/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1930. Dep: 17/01/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 550 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
29/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1933. Dep: 13/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
30/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1935. Dep: 21/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22997 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
21/10/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
24/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1938. Dep: 07/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1842 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
06/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1941. Dep: 01/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3730 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
11/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
01/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1945. Dep: 22/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3722 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
02/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3217 | ||
30/06/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
14/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1948. Dep: 01/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3735 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to BR 63217 |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
14/03/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63217 from Ardsley (37A) |