|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1909 | 30/10/1909 | General | Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1914 | 26/12/1914 | General | Boiler number 862 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1920 | 24/07/1920 | General | Boiler number 1406 (Diagram 4Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1922 | 23/12/1922 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1925 | 25/04/1925 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5153 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1927 | 23/07/1927 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1929 | 29/06/1929 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1930 | 06/12/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 165 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1933 | 06/05/1933 | 57 days | General | New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1935 | 18/01/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 651 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1938 | 25/06/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3721 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1941 | 01/02/1941 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1943 | 22/05/1943 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1946 | 09/02/1946 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3220 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1946 | 25/05/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 06/11/1948 | 20/11/1948 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3722 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to BR 63220 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 153 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4234 Allocated to Keadby (KEA) Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted |
||
1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: 30/10/1909. Work undertaken: Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 26/12/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 862 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 24/07/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1406 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
21/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1922. Dep: 23/12/1922. | ||
07/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1925. Dep: 25/04/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5153 |
||
30/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1927. Dep: 23/07/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
12/1928 | Modification | Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge | ||
11/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1929. Dep: 29/06/1929. | ||
15/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1930. Dep: 06/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 165 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
18/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
11/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933. Work undertaken: New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves |
||
28/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 651 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
04/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1938. Dep: 25/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3721 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
11/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1941. Dep: 01/02/1941. | ||
08/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1943. Dep: 22/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
09/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
17/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1946. Dep: 09/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3220 |
||
18/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946. | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
06/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1948. Dep: 20/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3722 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to BR 63220 |
||
14/03/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63220 from Barnsley (36D) |