Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 295 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1996 Week
» 10111 Month
» 137554 Year
» 1802930 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1074 m/e 07/1905
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6074   29/03/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4336
To Service During 07/1905 to Keadby (KEA)
Withdrawal Mon 20/01/1936 off Frodingham (FRO)
Service Life 30 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 25/1/36

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
KEA   Keadby (New) m/e 07/1905
FRO   Frodingham on 08/06/1932
     Withdrawn on 20/01/1936

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1905 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1111)
02/10/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 862)
01/08/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1262)
02/10/1920 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1916)
14/08/1926 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1677)
04/10/1930 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 40)
08/07/1933 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 438)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 1909 02/10/1909   General Boiler number 862 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1914 01/08/1914   General Boiler number 1262 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1920 02/10/1920   General Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1922 25/11/1922 43 days General    
Gorton Works 05/01/1924 29/03/1924 85 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6074
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1926 14/08/1926 57 days General Boiler number 1677 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1928 29/09/1928 43 days General    
Gorton Works 30/08/1930 04/10/1930 36 days General Boiler number 40 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1933 08/07/1933 15 days General Boiler number 438 (Diagram 17Sat)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1905 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1074
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4336
Allocated to Keadby (KEA)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: 02/10/1909.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 01/08/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1262 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 02/10/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
14/10/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1922. Dep: 25/11/1922.    
05/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1924. Dep: 29/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6074
   
19/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1926. Dep: 14/08/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1677 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
18/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1928. Dep: 29/09/1928.    
30/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1930. Dep: 04/10/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 40 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
08/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
24/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1933. Dep: 08/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 438 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
20/01/1936 Withdrawn Condemned as 6074 from Frodingham (FRO)    

prev prev