|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1908 | 04/01/1908 | General | Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1909 | 12/08/1909 | General | Boiler number 843 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1916 | 08/04/1916 | General | Boiler number 1610 (Diagram 17Sup) |
|||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1922 | 06/05/1922 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1415 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1923 | 20/10/1923 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1925 | 18/04/1925 | 57 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6077 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1927 | 04/02/1928 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 897 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1930 | 26/04/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1932 | 15/10/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1934 | 22/12/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1937 | 13/02/1937 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1940 | 30/11/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1943 | 1 day | Rebuilding | Tender sent to Woodford as a water carrier 6/1l/43 |
|||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1947 | 15/02/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3764 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1949 | 19/11/1949 | 43 days | General | New cylinders Boiler number 3744 (Diagram 17A) Renumbered to BR 69930 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1952 | 06/09/1952 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 22990 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/09/1952 | 17/09/1952 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1955 | 14/05/1955 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1955 | 18/05/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/03/1950 | Loco renumbering anomalies | No. 68370 was seen renumbered by 8/1/49 even though offical notification has only just come through. 61943 was at Neasden on 25/3/50. So far as we are aware, the transfer of 69930 to Stratford on 16/4 is interesting as being the first Q.1 to be stationed there. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1905 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1077 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4339 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
1908 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: 04/01/1908. Work undertaken: Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: 12/08/1909. Work undertaken: Boiler number 843 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
20/06/1914 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: 08/04/1916. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1610 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
11/03/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1922. Dep: 06/05/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1415 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
11/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1923. Dep: 20/10/1923. | ||
21/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1925. Dep: 18/04/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6077 |
||
19/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1927. Dep: 04/02/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 897 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
12/1928 | Modification | Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge | ||
22/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1930. Dep: 26/04/1930. | ||
08/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1932. Dep: 15/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
08/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1934. Dep: 22/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
06/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1937. Dep: 13/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
05/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
26/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
01/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 01/10/1943. Work undertaken: Tender sent to Woodford as a water carrier 6/1l/43 |
||
11/12/1943 | Modification | Diagram 17A number 3743 boiler fitted | ||
13/02/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
09/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
13/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 3222 but not taken up | ||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9930 | ||
25/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
25/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1947. Dep: 15/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3764 (Diagram 17A) |
||
08/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1949. Dep: 19/11/1949. Work undertaken: New cylinders Boiler number 3744 (Diagram 17A) Renumbered to BR 69930 |
||
16/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
27/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
10/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1952. Dep: 06/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22990 (Diagram 17A) |
||
09/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1952. Dep: 17/09/1952. | ||
01/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/04/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955. | ||
17/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/05/1955. Dep: 18/05/1955. | ||
02/10/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69930 from Frodingham (36C) |