Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 59 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4531 Week
» 23432 Month
» 23432 Year
» 1688808 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1142 m/e 03/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6142   07/03/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/103/1907
Q4/2 (0-8-0)01/12/1923
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4485
To Service During 03/1907 to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Withdrawal Sat 22/05/1937 off Langwith Junction (LNG)
Service Life 30 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction (New) m/e 03/1907
   Withdrawn on 22/05/1937

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1272)
21/10/1911 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 839)
05/07/1913 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 335)
20/01/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1273)
01/12/1923 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1650)
03/09/1927 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 835)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
06/09/1930 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1901)
14/01/1933 Diagram 19A boiler fitted (number 903)
18/05/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 138)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1911 21/10/1911   General
Boiler number 839 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1913 05/07/1913   General
Boiler number 335 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 20/01/1917   General
Returned to UK 8/6/19
Boiler number 1273 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 12/07/1919 02/08/1919 22 days General  
Gorton Works 30/07/1921 08/10/1921 71 days General  
Gorton Works 1923 01/12/1923   General
Boiler number 1650 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1925 07/03/1925 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6142
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1927 03/09/1927 78 days General
Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1928 21/07/1928 36 days General  
Gorton Works 09/08/1930 06/09/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1901 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1932 14/01/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1935 18/05/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1142
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4485
Allocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
22/05/1937 Withdrawn Condemned as 6142 from Langwith Junction (LNG)    

prev prev