Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 579 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6190 Week
» 17236 Month
» 17236 Year
» 1682612 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1143 m/e 04/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6143   14/02/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/104/1907
Q4/2 (0-8-0)07/01/1922
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4486
To Service During 04/1907 to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Withdrawal Sat 16/05/1936 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 29 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction (New) m/e 04/1907
ARD Ardsley on 31/01/1928
   Withdrawn on 16/05/1936

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1273)
25/02/1911 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1113)
23/11/1912 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 842)
02/03/1918 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 845)
07/01/1922 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 869)
07/01/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 892)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
14/02/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 831)
21/10/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 647)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1911 25/02/1911   General
Boiler number 1113 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1912 23/11/1912   General
Boiler number 842 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1918 02/03/1918   General
Boiler number 845 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1921 07/01/1922 99 days General
Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1923 01/09/1923 92 days General  
Gorton Works 20/12/1924 14/02/1925 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6143
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1927 07/01/1928 50 days General
Boiler number 892 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1931 14/02/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1933 21/10/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 647 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1143
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4486
Allocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
31/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
16/05/1936 Withdrawn Condemned as 6143 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev