|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1914 | 31/01/1914 | General | Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1920 | 31/07/1920 | General | Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 15/07/1922 | 16/09/1922 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1924 | 23/08/1924 | 113 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5039 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1927 | 06/08/1927 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 834 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1929 | 21/09/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1932 | 11/06/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1934 | 12/01/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1937 | 17/07/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 829 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to GCR Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1940 | 28/09/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1943 | 04/09/1943 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1947 | 28/06/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3737 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/12/1947 | 27/12/1947 | 8 days | Heavy | Boiler number 3736 (Diagram 17Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1909 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 39 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Keadby (KEA) Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 31/01/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 31/07/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
15/07/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1922. Dep: 16/09/1922. | ||
03/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1924. Dep: 23/08/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5039 |
||
18/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1927. Dep: 06/08/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 834 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
12/1928 | Modification | Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge | ||
10/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1929. Dep: 21/09/1929. | ||
04/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1932. Dep: 11/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
18/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
22/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1934. Dep: 12/01/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
03/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1937. Dep: 17/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 829 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to GCR Gauge |
||
07/01/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
07/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
24/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1940. Dep: 28/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
21/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
14/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3229 | ||
23/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
07/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3737 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
20/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/12/1947. Dep: 27/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3736 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
06/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
12/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
04/12/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3229 from Barnsley (36D) |