|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1913 | 23/08/1913 | General | Boiler number 868 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1920 | 26/06/1920 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1922 | 11/11/1922 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1924 | 11/10/1924 | 197 days | General | Boiler number 1691 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5048 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1926 | 15/01/1927 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/07/1927 | 06/08/1927 | 36 days | General | New L.H. cylinder |
||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1929 | 02/11/1929 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1931 | 15/08/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1679 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1933 | 09/12/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 54 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/04/1936 | 02/05/1936 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1939 | 07/10/1939 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3723 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1943 | 1 day | Rebuilding | Tender sent to Gorton 20/1/43. |
|||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1945 | 10/03/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1945 | 06/10/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3762 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1948 | 07/02/1948 | 22 days | Heavy | Boiler number 3744 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/07/1949 | 20/08/1949 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3763 (Diagram 17A) Renumbered to BR 69928 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1950 | 16/12/1950 | 27 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22981 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1952 | 31/01/1953 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 22991 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1953 | 18/02/1953 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1957 | 12/10/1957 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 22984 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1957 | 19/10/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
24/01/1959 | Frodingham MPD | Following the extensive use of diesel shunters here, the 5 Q1 0-8-0Ts allocated are now in store (69928/9/34/5/6). | SLS/195903 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1909 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 48 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
14/07/1909 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 23/08/1913. Work undertaken: Boiler number 868 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
20/03/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1920. Dep: 26/06/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
23/09/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1922. Dep: 11/11/1922. | ||
29/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1924. Dep: 11/10/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1691 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5048 |
||
23/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1926. Dep: 15/01/1927. | ||
02/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1927. Dep: 06/08/1927. Work undertaken: New L.H. cylinder |
||
30/04/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
12/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1929. Dep: 02/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
25/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1931. Dep: 15/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1679 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
25/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1933. Dep: 09/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 54 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
11/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1936. Dep: 02/05/1936. | ||
26/06/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
10/11/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
30/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3723 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
04/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 04/01/1943. Work undertaken: Tender sent to Gorton 20/1/43. |
||
20/03/1943 | Modification | Diagram 17A number 912 boiler fitted | ||
13/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
28/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
01/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
24/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/02/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945. | ||
01/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3762 (Diagram 17A) |
||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9928 | ||
17/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/01/1948. Dep: 07/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3744 (Diagram 17A) |
||
23/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1949. Dep: 20/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3763 (Diagram 17A) Renumbered to BR 69928 |
||
20/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1950. Dep: 16/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22981 (Diagram 17A) |
||
21/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1952. Dep: 31/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22991 (Diagram 17A) |
||
05/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1953. Dep: 18/02/1953. | ||
21/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1957. Dep: 12/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22984 (Diagram 17A) |
||
15/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/10/1957. Dep: 19/10/1957. | ||
15/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
20/08/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69928 from Frodingham (36C) |