Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 261 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1962 Week
» 10077 Month
» 137520 Year
» 1802896 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 63 m/e 07/1909
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5063   26/07/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/107/1909
Q4/2 (0-8-0)10/06/1933
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 07/1909 to Keadby (KEA)
Withdrawal Mon 22/06/1936 off Immingham (IMM)
Service Life 26 yrs, 11 mths , 23 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 27/6/36

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
KEA   Keadby (New) m/e 07/1909
IMM   Immingham on 01/11/1930
     Withdrawn on 22/06/1936

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1909 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1369)
25/07/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1371)
10/07/1920 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 352)
25/12/1926 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1916)
23/03/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 46A)
18/10/1930 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1138)
10/06/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 185)
10/06/1933 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 1914 25/07/1914   General Boiler number 1371 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1920 10/07/1920   General Boiler number 352 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1922 19/08/1922 64 days General    
Gorton Works 17/05/1924 26/07/1924 71 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5063
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1926 25/12/1926 71 days General Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1929 23/03/1929 43 days General Boiler number 46A (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1930 18/10/1930 22 days General Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1933 10/06/1933 15 days General Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1909 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 63
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Keadby (KEA)
Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted
   
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 25/07/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1371 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 10/07/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 352 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
17/06/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1922. Dep: 19/08/1922.    
17/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1924. Dep: 26/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5063
   
16/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1926. Dep: 25/12/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
09/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1929. Dep: 23/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 46A (Diagram 17Sat)
   
27/09/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1930. Dep: 18/10/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
01/11/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
27/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1933. Dep: 10/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
22/06/1936 Withdrawn Condemned as 5063 from Immingham (IMM)    

prev prev