Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 302 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2003 Week
» 10118 Month
» 137561 Year
» 1802937 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 356 m/e 10/1909
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5356   18/10/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/110/1909
Q4/2 (0-8-0)14/11/1914
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 10/1909
Withdrawal Sat 08/05/1937 off Frodingham (FRO)
Service Life 27 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1909
MEX   Mexborough on 11/12/1909
ARD   Ardsley on 31/01/1928
KEA   Keadby on 12/10/1929
FRO   Frodingham on 18/06/1932
     Withdrawn on 08/05/1937

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1909 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1372)
14/11/1914 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1402)
09/10/1920 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1918)
11/06/1932 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
11/06/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 832)
01/04/1933 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 839)
24/11/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 918)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 1914 14/11/1914   General Boiler number 1402 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1920 09/10/1920   General Boiler number 1918 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1922 16/12/1922 71 days General    
Gorton Works 16/08/1924 18/10/1924 64 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5356
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1927 09/07/1927 127 days General    
Gorton Works 18/01/1930 22/02/1930 36 days General    
Gorton Works 28/05/1932 11/06/1932 15 days General Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1933 01/04/1933 8 days General Boiler number 839 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1934 24/11/1934 15 days General Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1909 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 356
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted
   
11/12/1909 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 14/11/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1402 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 09/10/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1918 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/10/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1922. Dep: 16/12/1922.    
16/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1924. Dep: 18/10/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5356
   
05/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1927. Dep: 09/07/1927.    
31/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
12/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
18/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930.    
28/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1932. Dep: 11/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
18/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
25/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1933. Dep: 01/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 839 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
10/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1934. Dep: 24/11/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
08/05/1937 Withdrawn Condemned as 5356 from Frodingham (FRO)    

prev prev