|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1914 | 12/12/1914 | General | Boiler number 861 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1921 | 11/06/1921 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1923 | 05/04/1924 | 169 days | General | Boiler number 439 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5161 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1925 | 06/02/1926 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1928 | 01/09/1928 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1930 | 01/11/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1911 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1932 | 14/01/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1935 | 27/04/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 907 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/07/1937 | 24/07/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 601 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1939 | 13/01/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1942 | 26/09/1942 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 875 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1945 | 24/02/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/08/1947 | 20/09/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1949 | 19/02/1949 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | Secondhand cylinders ex-B9 1478 Renumbered to BR 63233 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1909 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 161 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted |
||
04/01/1913 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 12/12/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 861 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
23/04/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1921. Dep: 11/06/1921. | ||
20/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1923. Dep: 05/04/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 439 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5161 |
||
12/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1925. Dep: 06/02/1926. | ||
11/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1928. Dep: 01/09/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
12/1928 | Modification | Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge | ||
11/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1930. Dep: 01/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1911 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
31/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1932. Dep: 14/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
13/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1935. Dep: 27/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 907 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
10/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 601 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
30/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1939. Dep: 13/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
14/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 875 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
20/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
27/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3233 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
23/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1947. Dep: 20/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
29/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/01/1949. Dep: 19/02/1949. Work undertaken: Secondhand cylinders ex-B9 1478 Renumbered to BR 63233 |
||
06/02/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63233 from Barnsley (36D) |