|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1914 | 24/10/1914 | General | Boiler number 1365 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1919 | 01/11/1919 | General | Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1922 | 11/03/1922 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/07/1923 | 15/12/1923 | 155 days | General | Boiler number 319 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1925 | 02/05/1925 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5957 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/08/1927 | 26/11/1927 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1929 | 16/11/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1931 | 17/10/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1934 | 24/03/1934 | 15 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1910 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 957 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 24/10/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1365 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 01/11/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
21/01/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1922. Dep: 11/03/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
14/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1923. Dep: 15/12/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 319 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
28/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1925. Dep: 02/05/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5957 |
||
27/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1927. Dep: 26/11/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
12/1928 | Modification | Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge | ||
12/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1929. Dep: 16/11/1929. | ||
26/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1931. Dep: 17/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
10/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1934. Dep: 24/03/1934. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
28/04/1936 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5957 from Langwith Junction (LNG) |