|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1915 | 27/02/1915 | General | Boiler number 1375 (Diagram 17Sup) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1920 | 14/08/1920 | General | Boiler number 1405 (Diagram 4Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1922 | 16/09/1922 | 92 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1924 | 22/03/1924 | 50 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5959 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1926 | 06/11/1926 | 134 days | General | Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1929 | 23/02/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/02/1931 | 28/02/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1933 | 13/01/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/07/1936 | 18/07/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1939 | 03/06/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1941 | 01/11/1941 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 3731 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/07/1942 | 01/08/1942 | 9 days | Light Repair | Suspected loose wheel |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1944 | 1 day | Rebuilding | Tender sent to Gorton 14/4/44. |
|||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1947 | 21/06/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3765 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1949 | 03/12/1949 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3755 (Diagram 17A) Renumbered to BR 69932 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1952 | 16/08/1952 | 28 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1952 | 21/08/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | Boiler number 22989 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1955 | 16/04/1955 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 22988 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1955 | 26/04/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1956 | 03/11/1956 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 06/11/1956 | 07/11/1956 | 2 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1910 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 959 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
21/06/1913 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 27/02/1915. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1375 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 14/08/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1405 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
17/06/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1922. Dep: 16/09/1922. | ||
02/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 22/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5959 |
||
26/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1926. Dep: 06/11/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
19/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1929. Dep: 23/02/1929. | ||
14/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1931. Dep: 28/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
18/05/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
30/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1933. Dep: 13/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
04/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
20/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1939. Dep: 03/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
16/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1941. Dep: 01/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3731 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
24/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/07/1942. Dep: 01/08/1942. Work undertaken: Suspected loose wheel |
||
1944 | Modification | Diagram 17A number 3745 boiler fitted | ||
17/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 17/01/1944. Work undertaken: Tender sent to Gorton 14/4/44. |
||
14/04/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
02/07/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
17/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 3237 but not taken up | ||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9932 | ||
25/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
17/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3765 (Diagram 17A) |
||
08/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3755 (Diagram 17A) Renumbered to BR 69932 |
||
20/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1952. Dep: 16/08/1952. | ||
19/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1952. Dep: 21/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22989 (Diagram 17A) |
||
02/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1955. Dep: 16/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22988 (Diagram 17A) |
||
25/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 26/04/1955. | ||
01/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/10/1956. Dep: 03/11/1956. | ||
06/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/11/1956. Dep: 07/11/1956. | ||
12/11/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69932 from Frodingham (36C) |