|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1913 | 09/08/1913 | General | Boiler number 853 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1918 | 09/11/1918 | 148 days | General | New R.H. cylinder Boiler number 842 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/05/1921 | 25/06/1921 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1923 | 05/01/1924 | 162 days | General | Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1927 | 14/01/1928 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 40 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/07/1930 | 16/08/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 54 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1933 | 27/05/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 312 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1935 | 18/01/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3721 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1938 | 12/02/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1940 | 14/12/1940 | 15 days | General | New L.H. cylinder Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/09/1943 | 18/09/1943 | 10 days | Heavy | Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1947 | 26/04/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3730 (Diagram 17Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1910 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 962 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
08/02/1911 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 09/08/1913. Work undertaken: Boiler number 853 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
15/06/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1918. Dep: 09/11/1918. Work undertaken: New R.H. cylinder Boiler number 842 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
21/05/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1921. Dep: 25/06/1921. | ||
28/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1923. Dep: 05/01/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
31/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
02/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5962 | ||
14/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
19/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1927. Dep: 14/01/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 40 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
14/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
19/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1930. Dep: 16/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 54 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
13/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1933. Dep: 27/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 312 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
28/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3721 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
29/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1938. Dep: 12/02/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
30/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940. Work undertaken: New L.H. cylinder Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
05/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
09/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/09/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
23/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3238 | ||
22/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3730 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
06/02/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3238 from Barnsley (36D) |