Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 340 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2041 Week
» 10156 Month
» 137599 Year
» 1802975 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1177 y/e 1910
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6177   08/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3241   20/10/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During y/e 1910
Withdrawal Mon 17/04/1950 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 40 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 22/4/50

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) y/e 1910
MEX   Mexborough on 04/10/1910
DON   Doncaster on 18/03/1924
MAR   March on 15/07/1925
IMM   Immingham on 03/03/1929
KEA   Keadby on 20/09/1929
DON   Doncaster on 03/12/1929
BFD   Bradford Hammerton Street on 21/11/1934
ARD   Ardsley on 02/02/1941
     Withdrawn on 17/04/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN 37A Ardsley on 17/04/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
1910 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1403)
30/11/1918 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 857)
08/03/1924 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 419)
30/11/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
27/06/1931 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 201)
25/11/1933 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 439)
25/11/1933 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
08/08/1936 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 129)
08/08/1936 Modified to conform to GCR Gauge
15/07/1939 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 19)
24/01/1942 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 374)
31/07/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 913)
16/06/1945 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 918)
28/06/1947 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 3769)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 1918 30/11/1918   General Boiler number 857 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1921 17/09/1921 92 days General    
Gorton Works 29/09/1923 08/03/1924 162 days General Boiler number 419 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6177
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1927 10/12/1927 57 days General    
Gorton Works 16/03/1929 23/03/1929 8 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 09/11/1929 30/11/1929 22 days General Boiler number 129 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1931 27/06/1931 15 days General Boiler number 201 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1933 25/11/1933 15 days General Boiler number 439 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1936 08/08/1936 15 days General Boiler number 129 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to GCR Gauge
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1939 15/07/1939 8 days General Boiler number 19 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 07/01/1942 24/01/1942 18 days General Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1943 31/07/1943 26 days Heavy New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1945 16/06/1945 22 days General Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1947 28/06/1947 22 days General Boiler number 3769 (Diagram 17Sat)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1910 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1177
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
04/10/1910 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: 30/11/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 857 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
18/06/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1921. Dep: 17/09/1921.    
29/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1923. Dep: 08/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 419 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6177
   
18/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
15/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
15/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1927. Dep: 10/12/1927.    
03/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
16/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1929. Dep: 23/03/1929.    
20/09/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
09/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1929. Dep: 30/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 129 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
03/12/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
13/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 201 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
11/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1933. Dep: 25/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 439 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
21/11/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
25/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 129 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to GCR Gauge
   
08/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1939. Dep: 15/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 19 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
02/02/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
07/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1942. Dep: 24/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
06/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/07/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
26/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
20/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3241    
07/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3769 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
17/04/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 3241 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev