Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1008 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 2180 Week
» 21081 Month
» 21081 Year
» 1686457 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1182 m/e 02/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6182   31/10/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/102/1911
Q4/2 (0-8-0)09/06/1928
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 02/1911 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Tue 16/05/1939 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 28 yrs, 3 mths , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 02/1911
ARD Ardsley on 30/06/1928
   Withdrawn on 16/05/1939

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
22/12/1923 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 328)
09/06/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 851)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
07/02/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 589)
25/11/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 831)
04/07/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 834)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 26/02/1916 14/10/1916 232 days General
Returned to UK 8/6/19
 
Gorton Works 12/07/1919 09/08/1919 29 days General  
Gorton Works 12/03/1921 30/04/1921 50 days General  
Gorton Works 14/07/1923 22/12/1923 162 days General
Boiler number 328 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 29/08/1925 31/10/1925 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6182
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1928 09/06/1928 36 days General
Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1931 07/02/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 589 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1933 25/11/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1936 04/07/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 834 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1911 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1182
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 12A boiler fitted
   
30/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
16/05/1939 Withdrawn Condemned as 6182 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev