|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1911 | 04/1911 | General | Boiler number G328 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1919 | 12/1919 | General | Boiler number D1007 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1924 | 20/10/1924 | 70 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1927 | 09/09/1927 | 99 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1929 | 23/12/1929 | 50 days | General | Boiler number D988 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1931 | 23/12/1931 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/08/1935 | 02/10/1935 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/11/1937 | 13/12/1937 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2904 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1938 | 30/11/1938 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1940 | 05/08/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3126 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1943 | 27/05/1943 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3372 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1944 | 07/09/1944 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1945 | 27/10/1945 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2804 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/12/1946 | 24/12/1946 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1947 | 13/10/1947 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1902 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1708 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 6 02 Allocated to Starbeck (SBK) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
12/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1924. Dep: 20/10/1924. | ||
03/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1927. Dep: 09/09/1927. | ||
04/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1929. Dep: 23/12/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D988 (Diagram 56) |
||
09/04/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
05/05/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
17/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1931. Dep: 23/12/1931. | ||
23/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1935. Dep: 02/10/1935. | ||
01/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1937. Dep: 13/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2904 (Diagram 56B) |
||
07/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
08/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/11/1938. Dep: 30/11/1938. | ||
05/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
08/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1940. Dep: 05/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3126 (Diagram 56B) |
||
29/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1943. Dep: 27/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3372 (Diagram 56B) |
||
17/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/08/1944. Dep: 07/09/1944. | ||
02/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2804 (Diagram 56B) |
||
30/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3266 | ||
16/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/12/1946. Dep: 24/12/1946. | ||
13/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/10/1947. Dep: 13/10/1947. | ||
22/11/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3266 from Middlesbrough (MID) |