|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1919 | 10/1919 | General | Boiler number D994 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1924 | 22/11/1924 | 69 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/07/1927 | 19/10/1927 | 87 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1930 | 18/06/1930 | 66 days | General | Boiler number D1365 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1934 | 09/07/1934 | 27 days | General | Boiler number D859 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1937 | 04/02/1938 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 2929 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1939 | 20/03/1939 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1940 | 14/09/1940 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2904 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/12/1942 | 25/02/1943 | 64 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1945 | 07/04/1945 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3128 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 04/07/1946 | 18/07/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1947 | 06/06/1947 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1902 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1729 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 9 02 Allocated to Stockton (SKN) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
15/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1924. Dep: 22/11/1924. | ||
25/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1927. Dep: 19/10/1927. | ||
14/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1930. Dep: 18/06/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1365 (Diagram 56) |
||
15/12/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
13/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1934. Dep: 09/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D859 (Diagram 56) |
||
27/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
11/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1937. Dep: 04/02/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2929 (Diagram 56B) |
||
13/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/03/1939. Dep: 20/03/1939. | ||
12/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1940. Dep: 14/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2904 (Diagram 56B) |
||
24/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1942. Dep: 25/02/1943. | ||
07/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1945. Dep: 07/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3128 (Diagram 56B) |
||
14/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3269 | ||
04/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/07/1946. Dep: 18/07/1946. | ||
06/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 06/06/1947. Dep: 06/06/1947. | ||
19/07/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3269 from Middlesbrough (MID) |