|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1916 | 06/1916 | General | |||||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1923 | 28/04/1923 | 79 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1926 | 09/04/1927 | 201 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1929 | 20/09/1929 | 19 days | General | Boiler number D1080 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1931 | 20/03/1931 | 38 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1933 | 04/11/1933 | 31 days | General | Boiler number D1013 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1935 | 22/02/1936 | 73 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1936 | 26/02/1936 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1938 | 09/09/1938 | 33 days | General | Boiler number D1758 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1938 | 12/09/1938 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1941 | 11/07/1941 | 47 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/05/1943 | 17/05/1943 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1943 | 02/07/1943 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1944 | 02/03/1944 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2153 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 22/01/1946 | 31/01/1946 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1947 | 30/08/1947 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 3128 (Diagram 56B) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August | SLS/194810 |
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1903 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 715 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 15 03 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/06/1916 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D562 boiler fitted | ||
09/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1923. Dep: 28/04/1923. | ||
30/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
21/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1926. Dep: 09/04/1927. | ||
24/11/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thirsk (TSK) | ||
09/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
02/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1929. Dep: 20/09/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1080 (Diagram 56) |
||
11/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1931. Dep: 20/03/1931. | ||
05/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1933. Dep: 04/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1013 (Diagram 56) |
||
12/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1935. Dep: 22/02/1936. | ||
24/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1936. Dep: 26/02/1936. | ||
27/07/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
14/12/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
08/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1938. Dep: 09/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1758 (Diagram 56) |
||
09/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1938. Dep: 12/09/1938. | ||
02/09/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (KBY) | ||
21/05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
26/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1941. Dep: 11/07/1941. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
17/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/05/1943. Dep: 17/05/1943. | ||
19/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/06/1943. Dep: 02/07/1943. | ||
01/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1944. Dep: 02/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2153 (Diagram 56) |
||
22/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1946. Dep: 31/01/1946. | ||
05/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3285 | ||
26/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1947. Dep: 30/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3128 (Diagram 56B) |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
13/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
19/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63285 but not taken up | ||
10/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
16/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
27/09/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3285 from Selby (50C) | ||
10/1950 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |