|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1915 | 12/1915 | General | |||||
1922 | 02/1922 | General | |||||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1924 | 24/06/1924 | 76 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1927 | 30/05/1927 | 90 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1930 | 28/02/1930 | 45 days | General | Boiler number D1400 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1936 | 24/11/1936 | 48 days | General | Boiler number D1043 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1939 | 22/03/1939 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1940 | 22/06/1940 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1941 | 26/02/1941 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2278 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1942 | 11/05/1942 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 2279 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1943 | 07/08/1943 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2281 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 12/04/1945 | 03/05/1945 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1946 | 11/10/1946 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1907 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1215 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 525 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/12/1915 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D1932 boiler fitted | ||
07/02/1922 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D1364 boiler fitted | ||
10/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1924. Dep: 24/06/1924. | ||
02/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1927. Dep: 30/05/1927. | ||
15/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1930. Dep: 28/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1400 (Diagram 56) |
||
21/10/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
05/02/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
13/06/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
08/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1936. Dep: 24/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1043 (Diagram 56) |
||
28/03/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to East Hartlepool (EHL) | ||
09/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/02/1939. Dep: 22/03/1939. | ||
17/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
13/05/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
13/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
29/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/05/1940. Dep: 22/06/1940. | ||
14/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1941. Dep: 26/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2278 (Diagram 56) |
||
23/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1942. Dep: 11/05/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2279 (Diagram 56) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
30/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1943. Dep: 07/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2281 (Diagram 56) |
||
12/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1945. Dep: 03/05/1945. | ||
31/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3309 | ||
11/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 11/10/1946. Dep: 11/10/1946. | ||
07/12/1946 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3309 from West Hartlepool (WHL) |