|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1915 | 11/1915 | General | Boiler number G287 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1919 | 07/1919 | General | Boiler number D1925 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1922 | 04/05/1922 | General | |||||
Gateshead Works | 09/07/1925 | 18/09/1925 | 72 days | General | Boiler number D1470 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 14/03/1930 | 01/05/1930 | 49 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1934 | 11/04/1934 | 31 days | General | Rebuilt to class Q5/2 Boiler number D1808 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1937 | 29/10/1937 | 67 days | General | Boiler number D1988 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1940 | 14/01/1941 | 58 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1941 | 19/06/1941 | 29 days | General | Boiler number D1808 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1942 | 05/12/1942 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/07/1943 | 04/09/1943 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1944 | 01/06/1944 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1685 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1944 | 25/09/1944 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1946 | 25/09/1946 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 769 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to East Hartlepool (EHL) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
09/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1925. Dep: 18/09/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1470 (Diagram 56) |
||
14/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1930. Dep: 01/05/1930. | ||
12/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1934. Dep: 11/04/1934. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q5/2 Boiler number D1808 (Diagram 56A) |
||
24/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1937. Dep: 29/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1988 (Diagram 56A) |
||
22/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
27/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
18/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/11/1940. Dep: 14/01/1941. | ||
22/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1941. Dep: 19/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1808 (Diagram 56A) |
||
23/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/11/1942. Dep: 05/12/1942. | ||
23/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943. | ||
26/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1944. Dep: 01/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1685 (Diagram 56A) |
||
30/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/08/1944. Dep: 25/09/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 3329 but not taken up | ||
25/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/09/1946. Dep: 25/09/1946. | ||
21/12/1946 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 769 from Selby (SEL) |