|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 06/07/1923 | 26/07/1923 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/11/1923 | 02/02/1924 | 92 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/11/1923 | 02/02/1924 | 92 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1926 | 31/08/1926 | 148 days | General | Boiler number D130 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1926 | 22/02/1927 | 82 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1929 | 27/03/1929 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 2157 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1932 | 24/06/1932 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 25 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1936 | 27/07/1936 | 67 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1939 | 14/09/1939 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3023 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1942 | 25/02/1942 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3013 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1942 | 02/01/1943 | 36 days | Unclassified | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1944 | 22/04/1944 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2976 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 20/06/1945 | 11/07/1945 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 07/12/1946 | 11/01/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/07/1948 | 22/07/1948 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Gateshead Works | 30/08/1948 | 13/09/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63340 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/08/1949 | 08/09/1949 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2563 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1951 | 29/12/1951 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24279 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1953 | 23/01/1954 | 27 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1954 | 28/01/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1954 | 04/02/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1954 | 03/03/1954 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1955 | 28/09/1955 | 50 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1955 | 21/10/1955 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1956 | 25/06/1956 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24182 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1958 | 21/05/1958 | 42 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1958 | 24/06/1958 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1959 | 06/02/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1960 | 20/08/1960 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 24222 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1960 | 27/09/1960 | 27 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1247 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
06/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/07/1923. Dep: 26/07/1923. | ||
03/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1923. Dep: 02/02/1924. | ||
03/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1923. Dep: 02/02/1924. | ||
08/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
06/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1926. Dep: 31/08/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number D130 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1926. Dep: 22/02/1927. | ||
21/02/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
31/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1929. Dep: 27/03/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2157 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1932. Dep: 24/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/04/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
22/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1936. Dep: 27/07/1936. | ||
29/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
16/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1939. Dep: 14/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3023 (Diagram 50A) |
||
19/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
27/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1942. Dep: 25/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3013 (Diagram 50A) |
||
28/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/11/1942. Dep: 02/01/1943. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
01/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
30/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2976 (Diagram 50A) |
||
20/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/06/1945. Dep: 11/07/1945. | ||
28/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3340 | ||
07/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1946. Dep: 11/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 50A) |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
22/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 22/07/1948. Dep: 22/07/1948. | ||
30/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/08/1948. Dep: 13/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63340 |
||
15/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1949. Dep: 08/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2563 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
03/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1951. Dep: 29/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24279 (Diagram 50A) |
||
28/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/12/1953. Dep: 23/01/1954. | ||
25/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/01/1954. Dep: 28/01/1954. | ||
01/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/02/1954. Dep: 04/02/1954. | ||
25/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/02/1954. Dep: 03/03/1954. | ||
10/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/08/1955. Dep: 28/09/1955. | ||
06/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1955. Dep: 21/10/1955. | ||
31/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1956. Dep: 25/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24182 (Diagram 50A) |
||
10/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/04/1958. Dep: 21/05/1958. | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
13/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/06/1958. Dep: 24/06/1958. | ||
26/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
02/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1959. Dep: 06/02/1959. | ||
24/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1960. Dep: 20/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24222 (Diagram 50A) |
||
01/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/09/1960. Dep: 27/09/1960. | ||
15/07/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63340 from West Auckland (51F) |