Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 358 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6285 Week
» 5023 Month
» 419344 Year
» 1640909 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1252 m/e 03/1913
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3345   28/04/1946
British Railways 63345 w/e 12/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q603/1913
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number 441A
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 03/1913 to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Withdrawal Mon 08/06/1964 off Sunderland (52G)
Service Life 51 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 30/6/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NPT Newport (Teeside) (New) m/e 03/1913
SBK Starbeck on 09/04/1931
NEV Neville Hill on 28/03/1943
HAV Haverton Hill on 19/06/1943
NPT Newport (Teeside) on 20/09/1944
51G Haverton Hill on 10/06/1956
52K Consett on 08/05/1959
52G Sunderland on 06/05/1962
   Withdrawn on 08/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NPT Newport (Teeside) w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 51G Haverton Hill 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 54D Consett 4w/e 21/03/1959
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 02/06/1962
WDN   on 08/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1913 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D172)
24/07/1923 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D222)
15/07/1929 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D204)
26/09/1932 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2430)
14/04/1939 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D1941)
13/06/1941 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D2259)
02/09/1943 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2435)
09/03/1946 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2157)
02/04/1953 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 24197)
05/08/1955 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24246)
20/12/1957 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24202)
10/03/1961 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24331)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 19/04/1923 24/07/1923 97 days General
Boiler number D222 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 07/09/1926 17/12/1926 102 days General  
Darlington Works 28/01/1927 18/02/1927 22 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 13/05/1929 15/07/1929 64 days General
Boiler number D204 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 09/08/1932 26/09/1932 49 days General
Boiler number 2430 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 01/08/1934 29/08/1934 29 days General  
Darlington Works 06/08/1936 23/09/1936 49 days General  
Darlington Works 28/02/1939 14/04/1939 46 days General
Boiler number D1941 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 08/05/1941 13/06/1941 37 days General
Boiler number D2259 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 07/08/1943 02/09/1943 27 days General
Boiler number 2435 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 11/02/1946 09/03/1946 27 days General
Boiler number 2157 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 21/05/1947 06/06/1947 17 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 05/05/1948 11/06/1948 38 days General
Boiler number 24176 (Diagram 50)
Renumbered to BR 63345
 
Darlington Works 11/12/1950 20/01/1951 41 days General  
Darlington Works 22/01/1951 24/01/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/03/1953 02/04/1953 28 days General
Boiler number 24197 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 14/04/1953 24/04/1953 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 04/06/1954 15/06/1954 12 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 26/02/1955 05/03/1955 8 days Light Casual  
Gateshead Works 07/07/1955 05/08/1955 30 days General
Boiler number 24246 (Diagram 50A)
 
Gateshead Works 18/11/1957 20/12/1957 33 days General
Boiler number 24202 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 25/11/1960 10/03/1961 106 days General
Boiler number 24331 (Diagram 50A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order.
Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year.
No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751.
Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420.
SLS/194808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1913 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1252
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
09/04/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
19/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV)    
20/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
28/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3345    
10/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G)    
08/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (52K)    
06/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
08/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63345 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev