|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 22/12/1922 | 10/04/1923 | 110 days | General | Boiler number D130 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1926 | 16/07/1926 | 130 days | General | Boiler number D204 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1926 | 12/08/1926 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1929 | 31/05/1929 | 46 days | General | Boiler number D1170 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1933 | 03/07/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number D863 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1936 | 18/12/1936 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2394 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1939 | 28/07/1939 | 100 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1942 | 05/02/1942 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2430 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1943 | 03/07/1943 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1944 | 14/06/1944 | 24 days | General | Boiler number D1945 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1945 | 25/10/1945 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 27/08/1946 | 21/09/1946 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24268 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 09/11/1947 | 27/11/1947 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/07/1948 | 13/07/1948 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1949 | 14/04/1949 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2993 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63348 |
||
Gateshead Works | 14/11/1950 | 11/12/1950 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1951 | 29/06/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24192 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1951 | 09/07/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1952 | 15/11/1952 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1954 | 27/02/1954 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 24189 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1954 | 03/03/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/03/1957 | 04/05/1957 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24261 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1957 | 09/05/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1960 | 10/12/1960 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24333 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1960 | 12/01/1961 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1962 | 11/07/1962 | 17 days | Light Casual | After collision |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
13/09/1959 | Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed | The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. | SLS/195911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1257 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
22/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1922. Dep: 10/04/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number D130 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1926. Dep: 16/07/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number D204 (Diagram 50) |
||
30/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/07/1926. Dep: 12/08/1926. | ||
16/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1929. Dep: 31/05/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1170 (Diagram 50) |
||
29/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1933. Dep: 03/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D863 (Diagram 50) |
||
04/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1936. Dep: 18/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2394 (Diagram 50) |
||
20/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1939. Dep: 28/07/1939. | ||
07/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1942. Dep: 05/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2430 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/06/1943. Dep: 03/07/1943. | ||
08/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
22/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1944. Dep: 14/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1945 (Diagram 50) |
||
04/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
05/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
25/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 25/10/1945. Dep: 25/10/1945. | ||
31/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3348 | ||
27/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24268 (Diagram 50A) |
||
09/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/11/1947. Dep: 27/11/1947. | ||
04/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/07/1948. Dep: 13/07/1948. | ||
23/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1949. Dep: 14/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2993 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63348 |
||
04/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
20/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
26/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
14/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/11/1950. Dep: 11/12/1950. | ||
04/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1951. Dep: 29/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24192 (Diagram 50A) |
||
05/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1951. Dep: 09/07/1951. | ||
20/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/10/1952. Dep: 15/11/1952. | ||
25/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
09/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1954. Dep: 27/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24189 (Diagram 50A) |
||
01/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/03/1954. Dep: 03/03/1954. | ||
28/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1957. Dep: 04/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24261 (Diagram 50A) |
||
06/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1957. Dep: 09/05/1957. | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
06/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
11/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1960. Dep: 10/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24333 (Diagram 50A) |
||
29/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/12/1960. Dep: 12/01/1961. | ||
25/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/06/1962. Dep: 11/07/1962. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
17/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63348 from Neville Hill (55H) |