|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 30/05/1923 | 27/09/1923 | 121 days | General | Boiler number D139 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1925 | 08/01/1926 | 110 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1928 | 21/08/1928 | 61 days | General | Boiler number E4/22 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1930 | 27/11/1930 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D610 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1934 | 15/03/1934 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 2562 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1936 | 15/05/1936 | 64 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/05/1936 | 21/05/1936 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1938 | 09/05/1938 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1938 | 15/08/1938 | 78 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1940 | 07/09/1940 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2262 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1943 | 17/03/1943 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2425 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 23/06/1944 | 06/07/1944 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 14/02/1946 | 14/03/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2653 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 17/04/1947 | 01/05/1947 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1948 | 31/12/1948 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 3857 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63352 |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1952 | 24/05/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24225 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/10/1955 | 29/10/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24250 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1955 | 01/11/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/10/1957 | 11/10/1957 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1957 | 06/12/1957 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1958 | 13/08/1958 | 37 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 24181 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 15/09/1958 | 26/09/1958 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1960 | 18/06/1960 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1960 | 05/07/1960 | 16 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1271 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
30/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1923. Dep: 27/09/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number D139 (Diagram 50) |
||
01/07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
01/09/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
21/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1925. Dep: 08/01/1926. | ||
22/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1928. Dep: 21/08/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/22 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1930. Dep: 27/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D610 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1934. Dep: 15/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2562 (Diagram 50) |
||
13/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1936. Dep: 15/05/1936. | ||
19/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1936. Dep: 21/05/1936. | ||
25/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1938. Dep: 09/05/1938. | ||
30/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/05/1938. Dep: 15/08/1938. | ||
05/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1940. Dep: 07/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2262 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1943. Dep: 17/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2425 (Diagram 50) |
||
04/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
23/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/06/1944. Dep: 06/07/1944. | ||
14/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1946. Dep: 14/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2653 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3352 | ||
17/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/04/1947. Dep: 01/05/1947. | ||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
08/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1948. Dep: 31/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3857 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63352 |
||
01/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1952. Dep: 24/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24225 (Diagram 50A) |
||
04/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1955. Dep: 29/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24250 (Diagram 50) |
||
31/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/10/1955. Dep: 01/11/1955. | ||
04/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/10/1957. Dep: 11/10/1957. | ||
26/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/11/1957. Dep: 06/12/1957. | ||
08/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/07/1958. Dep: 13/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24181 (Diagram 50A) |
||
15/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/09/1958. Dep: 26/09/1958. | ||
08/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
05/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/05/1960. Dep: 18/06/1960. | ||
20/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/06/1960. Dep: 05/07/1960. | ||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
25/02/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63352 from Blyth (North) (52F) |