|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1922 | 07/1922 | General | ||||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1924 | 13/08/1924 | 92 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1927 | 29/09/1927 | 113 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1929 | 26/11/1929 | 50 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1932 | 01/07/1932 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2157 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1936 | 13/01/1937 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 24170 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1938 | 10/01/1939 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1939 | 02/12/1939 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1941 | 03/10/1941 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24230 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1942 | 07/12/1942 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24176 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/02/1945 | 14/03/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 11/06/1946 | 22/06/1946 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1947 | 10/10/1947 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24222 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1950 | 09/06/1950 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 988 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63378 |
||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1952 | 05/12/1952 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24286 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1955 | 02/04/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24296 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1955 | 06/04/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1955 | 19/04/1955 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1957 | 14/03/1957 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 24305 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1957 | 25/03/1957 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/09/1960 | 29/10/1960 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 24182 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1960 | 06/12/1960 | 33 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1964 | 31/01/1964 | 1 day | Weighing |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1917 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2221 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: ?/07/1922. | ||
14/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1924. Dep: 13/08/1924. | ||
09/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1927. Dep: 29/09/1927. | ||
08/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1929. Dep: 26/11/1929. | ||
01/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1932. Dep: 01/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2157 (Diagram 50) |
||
01/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1936. Dep: 13/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24170 (Diagram 50) |
||
19/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/12/1938. Dep: 10/01/1939. | ||
07/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
27/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1939. Dep: 02/12/1939. | ||
02/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1941. Dep: 03/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24230 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1942. Dep: 07/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24176 (Diagram 50) |
||
14/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1945. Dep: 14/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 50A) |
||
11/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/06/1946. Dep: 22/06/1946. | ||
14/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3378 | ||
17/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1947. Dep: 10/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24222 (Diagram 50A) |
||
14/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Normanton (20D) | ||
20/11/1948 | Allocation | |||
26/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
01/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
02/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1950. Dep: 09/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 988 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63378 |
||
13/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1952. Dep: 05/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24286 (Diagram 50A) |
||
03/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (50G) | ||
01/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
08/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1955. Dep: 02/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24296 (Diagram 50A) |
||
04/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/04/1955. Dep: 06/04/1955. | ||
13/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1955. Dep: 19/04/1955. | ||
21/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1957. Dep: 14/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24305 (Diagram 50A) |
||
19/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1957. Dep: 25/03/1957. | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
14/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
19/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1960. Dep: 29/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24182 (Diagram 50A) |
||
04/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/11/1960. Dep: 06/12/1960. | ||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
31/01/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 31/01/1964. Dep: 31/01/1964. | ||
05/04/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63378 from Tyne Dock (52H) |