Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 85 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6012 Week
» 4750 Month
» 419071 Year
» 1640636 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2228 m/e 10/1917
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3385   15/09/1946
British Railways 63385 m/e 31/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q610/1917
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number 111A
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 10/1917 to Selby (SEL)
Withdrawal Wed 16/10/1963 off Sunderland (52G)
Service Life 46 yrs , 16 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 26/11/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SEL Selby (New) m/e 10/1917
SCA Scarborough on 17/02/1925
YK York (North) on 06/07/1925
SCA Scarborough on 04/01/1926
YK York (North) on 14/05/1928
NEV Neville Hill on 17/06/1939
DAR Darlington on 14/07/1943
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 04/11/1944
BLA Blaydon on 20/07/1947
52G Sunderland on 24/02/1963
   Withdrawn on 16/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BLA Blaydon on 20/07/1947
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 3w/e 02/03/1963
WDN   on 16/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1917 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D677)
27/08/1924 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D131)
01/10/1928 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D226)
08/01/1932 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D697)
22/10/1934 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number AW34)
14/05/1937 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2890)
17/06/1944 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2890)
19/10/1956 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 24195)
21/08/1959 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24318)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 27/05/1924 27/08/1924 93 days General
Boiler number D131 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 26/07/1928 01/10/1928 68 days General
Boiler number D226 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 04/11/1931 08/01/1932 66 days General
Boiler number D697 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 09/08/1934 22/10/1934 75 days General
Boiler number AW34 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 09/11/1934 19/11/1934 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/03/1937 14/05/1937 51 days General
Boiler number 24247 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 08/12/1938 28/12/1938 21 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 22/08/1939 20/09/1939 30 days General  
Darlington Works 06/11/1941 05/12/1941 30 days General
Boiler number 24170 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 02/02/1943 13/02/1943 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/05/1944 17/06/1944 25 days General
Boiler number 24247 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 15/12/1945 31/12/1945 17 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 14/05/1947 28/06/1947 46 days General
Boiler number 24166 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 25/10/1950 02/12/1950 39 days General
Renumbered to BR 63385
 
Darlington Works 14/08/1953 05/09/1953 23 days General
Boiler number 24196 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 14/09/1953 17/09/1953 4 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 19/11/1954 17/12/1954 29 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 14/01/1955 24/01/1955 11 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 27/09/1956 19/10/1956 23 days General
Boiler number 24195 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 25/10/1956 25/10/1956 1 day Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 15/01/1959 06/02/1959 23 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 06/07/1959 21/08/1959 47 days General
Boiler number 24318 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 28/08/1959 15/09/1959 19 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1917 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2228
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Selby (SEL)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
17/02/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA)    
06/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
04/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA)    
14/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
17/06/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
14/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
04/11/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
15/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3385    
20/07/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
24/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
16/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63385 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev