Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 344 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6271 Week
» 5009 Month
» 419330 Year
» 1640895 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2230 m/e 11/1917
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3387   28/07/1946
British Railways 63387 w/e 25/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q611/1917
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number 111A
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 11/1917 to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Withdrawal Sat 09/09/1967 off West Hartlepool (51C)
Service Life 49 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap 10 TJ Thompson, Stockton, 10/67

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLS Hull Springhead (New) m/e 11/1917
EHL East Hartlepool on 26/01/1927
WHL West Hartlepool on 17/04/1939
SEL Selby on 06/09/1941
54B Tyne Dock on 17/08/1952
52K Consett on 01/11/1959
52C Blaydon on 11/09/1960
52G Sunderland on 24/02/1963
55H Neville Hill on 03/10/1965
55E Normanton on 12/06/1966
52H Tyne Dock on 02/10/1966
51C West Hartlepool on 02/07/1967
   Withdrawn on 09/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 54D Consett 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 3w/e 02/03/1963
ALLOC 55H Neville Hill 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 18/06/1966
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 4w/e 08/10/1966
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 15/07/1967
WDN   4w/e 09/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
0000 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D154(XXX))
11/1917 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D697)
20/01/1930 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number HL982)
27/04/1934 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2582)
09/04/1941 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D1945)
28/04/1944 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2385)
18/10/1949 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 3004)
18/01/1952 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24214)
04/03/1955 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24211)
25/04/1958 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24266)
04/04/1963 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24163)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 1922 07/1922   General  
Darlington Works 03/09/1924 12/12/1924 101 days General  
Gateshead Works 15/11/1929 20/01/1930 67 days General
Boiler number HL982 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 26/03/1930 05/04/1930 11 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 25/04/1930 04/06/1930 41 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 05/04/1934 27/04/1934 23 days General
Boiler number 2582 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 03/09/1937 13/10/1937 41 days General  
Darlington Works 14/05/1940 12/06/1940 30 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 08/03/1941 09/04/1941 33 days General
Boiler number D1945 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 14/07/1942 15/08/1942 33 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 03/04/1944 28/04/1944 26 days General
Boiler number 2385 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 09/09/1945 26/09/1945 18 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 15/03/1947 26/04/1947 43 days General
Boiler number 24198 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 14/05/1947 21/05/1947 8 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 12/09/1948 21/09/1948 10 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63387
 
Darlington Works 15/09/1949 18/10/1949 34 days General
Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 20/10/1950 01/11/1950 13 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 18/12/1951 18/01/1952 32 days General
Boiler number 24214 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 24/01/1952 30/01/1952 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 29/06/1953 11/07/1953 13 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/02/1955 04/03/1955 25 days General
Boiler number 24211 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 10/03/1955 15/03/1955 6 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 20/02/1957 05/04/1957 45 days Light Casual  
Gateshead Works 24/03/1958 25/04/1958 33 days General
Boiler number 24266 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 04/03/1963 04/04/1963 32 days General
Boiler number 24163 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 29/12/1965 25/01/1966 28 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302
03/12/1966 Allocation of Q6 class (Tyne Dock) Tyne Dock: 63344/66/81/7, 63413/20/6/9/31/55/8; Sunderland: 63346/95, 63405/36/7; West Hartlepool: 63368/94/7, 63407/40/50. SLS/196701
02/07/1967 Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Tyne Dock) Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). SLS/196708
13/08/1967 West Hartlepool MPD The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Modification Diagram 50 number D154(XXX) boiler fitted    
11/1917 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2230
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
26/01/1927 Allocation Reallocated to East Hartlepool (EHL)    
17/04/1939 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
06/09/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
28/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3387    
17/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
01/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (52K)    
11/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
24/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
03/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H)    
12/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
02/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
02/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
09/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 63387 from West Hartlepool (51C)    

prev prev