Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 302 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6229 Week
» 4967 Month
» 419288 Year
» 1640853 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2249 m/e 06/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3406   27/10/1946
British Railways 63406 w/e 20/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q606/1919
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number 141A
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 06/1919 to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Withdrawal Sun 31/07/1966 off Sunderland (52G)
Service Life 47 yrs , 2 mths

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Hughes, Bolckow, Blyth, 9/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) m/e 06/1919
MEX Mexborough on 15/12/1933
HLD Hull Dairycoates m/e 1934
SEL Selby on 02/10/1935
MEX Mexborough on 07/12/1935
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 28/06/1936
NPT Newport (Teeside) on 05/05/1937
HAV Haverton Hill on 27/05/1937
WHL West Hartlepool on 26/11/1938
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 01/07/1939
SEL Selby on 07/10/1939
54B Tyne Dock on 16/06/1957
52K Consett on 18/01/1959
52G Sunderland on 08/09/1963
   Withdrawn on 31/07/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 54D Consett 4w/e 24/01/1959
ALLOC 52G Sunderland w/e 14/09/1963
WDN   w/e 02/11/1964
WDN   w/e 31/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D940)
28/10/1927 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D619)
15/04/1936 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D671)
09/08/1939 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2813)
12/03/1940 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2818)
17/02/1942 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2875)
29/06/1944 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 3138)
08/02/1947 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2862)
10/08/1949 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2888)
16/02/1952 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 24215)
13/08/1954 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24261)
01/03/1957 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24205)
16/12/1961 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24274)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 04/04/1924 28/06/1924 86 days General  
Darlington Works 13/07/1927 28/10/1927 108 days General
Boiler number D619 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 09/01/1930 15/02/1930 38 days General  
Darlington Works 09/06/1932 18/07/1932 40 days General  
Darlington Works 15/01/1936 15/04/1936 92 days General
Boiler number D671 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 05/07/1939 09/08/1939 36 days General
Boiler number 2813 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 04/01/1940 12/03/1940 69 days General
Boiler number 2818 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 25/01/1941 30/01/1941 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/01/1942 17/02/1942 28 days General
Boiler number 2875 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 10/07/1942 06/08/1942 28 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/06/1944 29/06/1944 22 days General
Boiler number 3138 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 13/12/1946 08/02/1947 58 days General
Boiler number 24230 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 31/10/1948 16/11/1948 17 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63406
 
Darlington Works 29/06/1949 10/08/1949 43 days General
Boiler number 2888 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 15/08/1949 18/08/1949 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/01/1952 16/02/1952 23 days General
Boiler number 24215 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 18/02/1952 20/02/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 06/03/1952 26/03/1952 21 days Light Casual
After derailment
 
Darlington Works 23/03/1953 18/04/1953 27 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 21/07/1954 13/08/1954 24 days General
Boiler number 24261 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 12/02/1957 01/03/1957 18 days General
Boiler number 24205 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 04/03/1957 07/03/1957 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/03/1957 21/03/1957 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/02/1960 10/03/1960 32 days General
Boiler number 24187 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 20/11/1961 16/12/1961 27 days General
Boiler number 24274 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 21/12/1961 03/01/1962 14 days Unclassified
After collision
 
Darlington Works 19/01/1962 06/02/1962 19 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 12/08/1963 02/09/1963 22 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/02/1964 03/02/1964 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 20/05/1964 20/05/1964 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 23/03/1965 23/03/1965 1 day Weighing  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2249
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
15/12/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1934 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
02/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
07/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
28/06/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
05/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
27/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV)    
26/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
01/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
07/10/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3406    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
18/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (52K)    
08/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
31/07/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 63406 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev