Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 330 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6257 Week
» 4995 Month
» 419316 Year
» 1640881 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2279 m/e 06/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3436   25/08/1946
British Railways 63436 w/e 29/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q606/1920
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number E4
Works Number 27
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 06/1920 to Borough Gardens (BOR)
Withdrawal Mon 24/04/1967 off Sunderland (52G)
Service Life 46 yrs, 10 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Hughes Bolckow, Blyth, 7/67

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BOR Borough Gardens (New) m/e 06/1920
BLA Blaydon on 29/03/1941
NPT Newport (Teeside) on 28/03/1943
NEV Neville Hill on 02/09/1944
SEL Selby on 05/10/1947
50B Neville Hill on 25/01/1953
50C Selby on 16/06/1957
50A York (North) on 13/09/1959
50B Neville Hill on 06/12/1959
52G Sunderland on 13/10/1963
   Withdrawn on 24/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SEL Selby w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 50C Selby 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 50A York (North) on 13/09/1959
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 09/11/1963
WDN   on 24/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1920 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number E4/27)
25/09/1934 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number AW3)
17/12/1938 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 2985)
07/06/1941 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 2989)
31/12/1943 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 2999)
27/03/1952 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24224)
16/01/1958 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24219)
20/10/1961 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24260)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 25/05/1923 01/08/1923 69 days General  
Gateshead Works 03/08/1925 15/10/1925 74 days General  
Gateshead Works 03/07/1928 31/08/1928 60 days General  
Gateshead Works 01/10/1931 05/11/1931 36 days General  
Darlington Works 02/11/1932 19/12/1932 48 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 28/08/1934 25/09/1934 29 days General
Boiler number AW3 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 07/09/1938 17/12/1938 102 days General
Boiler number 2985 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 30/04/1941 07/06/1941 39 days General
Boiler number 2989 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 09/06/1941 16/06/1941 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 30/11/1943 31/12/1943 32 days General
Boiler number 2999 (Diagram 50A)
 
Gateshead Works 03/01/1946 18/01/1946 16 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 28/03/1947 17/05/1947 51 days General  
Gateshead Works 09/01/1949 26/01/1949 18 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63436
 
Darlington Works 06/12/1949 06/01/1950 32 days General
Boiler number 24198 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 03/07/1951 20/07/1951 18 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 15/10/1951 10/11/1951 27 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 11/03/1952 27/03/1952 17 days General
Boiler number 24224 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 10/09/1954 02/10/1954 23 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 15/11/1955 22/12/1955 38 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 12/09/1957 26/09/1957 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 19/12/1957 16/01/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 24219 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 21/09/1961 20/10/1961 30 days General
Boiler number 24260 (Diagram 50A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/09/1959 Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. SLS/195911
03/12/1966 Allocation of Q6 class (Sunderland) Tyne Dock: 63344/66/81/7, 63413/20/6/9/31/55/8; Sunderland: 63346/95, 63405/36/7; West Hartlepool: 63368/94/7, 63407/40/50. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2279
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 27
Allocated to Borough Gardens (BOR)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
29/03/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
02/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
25/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3436    
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
25/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (50C)    
13/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
06/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
13/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
24/04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 63436 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev