|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 11/04/1923 | 30/06/1923 | 81 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1925 | 28/10/1925 | 91 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1928 | 15/05/1928 | 60 days | General | Boiler number D598 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1930 | 24/09/1930 | 59 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1933 | 15/05/1933 | 42 days | General | Boiler number E4/41 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/07/1936 | 11/09/1936 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2815 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1938 | 11/01/1939 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/06/1941 | 10/07/1941 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2817 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1943 | 22/05/1943 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2993 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 08/03/1945 | 27/03/1945 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1946 | 28/09/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2888 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3440 |
||
Gateshead Works | 23/02/1948 | 11/03/1948 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/04/1949 | 12/05/1949 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2816 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63440 |
||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1949 | 07/06/1949 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1951 | 22/12/1951 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24276 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 21/12/1953 | 16/01/1954 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1954 | 18/12/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24221 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1955 | 25/01/1955 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/05/1957 | 21/06/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24189 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1959 | 07/08/1959 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1961 | 11/03/1961 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1961 | 17/08/1961 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1962 | 23/10/1962 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 24284 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1962 | 20/11/1962 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/03/1964 | 26/03/1964 | 1 day | Weighing |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
03/12/1966 | Allocation of Q6 class (West Hartlepool) | Tyne Dock: 63344/66/81/7, 63413/20/6/9/31/55/8; Sunderland: 63346/95, 63405/36/7; West Hartlepool: 63368/94/7, 63407/40/50. | SLS/196701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2283 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 31 Allocated to Selby (SEL) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
11/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1923. Dep: 30/06/1923. | ||
30/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1925. Dep: 28/10/1925. | ||
17/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1928. Dep: 15/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D598 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
28/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1930. Dep: 24/09/1930. | ||
04/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1933. Dep: 15/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/41 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1936. Dep: 11/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2815 (Diagram 50) |
||
29/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1938. Dep: 11/01/1939. | ||
20/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
02/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1941. Dep: 10/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2817 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1943. Dep: 22/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2993 (Diagram 50A) |
||
23/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
24/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
08/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1945. Dep: 27/03/1945. | ||
31/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1946. Dep: 28/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2888 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3440 |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
23/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1948. Dep: 11/03/1948. | ||
19/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1949. Dep: 12/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2816 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63440 |
||
23/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/05/1949. Dep: 07/06/1949. | ||
28/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1951. Dep: 22/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24276 (Diagram 50A) |
||
12/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (50G) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (50G) | ||
21/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
21/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/12/1953. Dep: 16/01/1954. | ||
18/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1954. Dep: 18/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24221 (Diagram 50A) |
||
07/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/01/1955. Dep: 25/01/1955. | ||
21/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1957. Dep: 21/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24189 (Diagram 50A) |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
14/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
04/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/08/1959. Dep: 07/08/1959. | ||
10/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/02/1961. Dep: 11/03/1961. | ||
17/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 17/08/1961. Dep: 17/08/1961. | ||
18/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1962. Dep: 23/10/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24284 (Diagram 50A) |
||
09/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/11/1962. Dep: 20/11/1962. | ||
26/03/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 26/03/1964. Dep: 26/03/1964. | ||
31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63440 from West Hartlepool (51C) |