Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 348 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6275 Week
» 5013 Month
» 419334 Year
» 1640899 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2288 m/e 09/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3445   08/12/1946
British Railways 63445 m/e 30/06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q609/1920
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number E4
Works Number 36
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 09/1920 to Borough Gardens (BOR)
Withdrawal Sun 26/06/1966 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Service Life 45 yrs, 9 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Hughes Bolckow, Blyth, 8/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BOR Borough Gardens (New) m/e 09/1920
NPT Newport (Teeside) on 09/10/1934
NEV Neville Hill on 30/05/1948
NPT Newport (Teeside) on 06/02/1949
51L Thornaby on 01/06/1958
55H Neville Hill on 16/12/1962
52G Sunderland on 13/10/1963
52H Tyne Dock on 19/06/1966
   Withdrawn on 26/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
ALLOC 55H Neville Hill 5w/e 12/01/1963
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 09/11/1963
WDN   on 26/06/1966
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 4w/e 16/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1920 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number E4/36)
05/11/1928 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2149)
24/08/1935 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number AW28)
03/08/1937 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D930)
27/09/1939 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number AW13)
02/10/1942 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number HL105)
13/01/1945 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2437)
29/03/1947 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2566)
23/06/1950 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 3847)
24/09/1955 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24300)
03/04/1958 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24290)
27/10/1961 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24169)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 20/07/1923 11/09/1923 54 days General  
Gateshead Works 21/12/1925 08/03/1926 78 days General  
Gateshead Works 15/04/1926 09/06/1926 56 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 20/09/1928 05/11/1928 47 days General
Boiler number 2149 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 16/08/1929 23/08/1929 8 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 10/09/1931 14/10/1931 35 days General  
Darlington Works 30/07/1935 24/08/1935 26 days General
Boiler number AW28 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 23/09/1935 22/10/1935 30 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 27/04/1937 03/08/1937 99 days General
Boiler number D930 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 24/08/1939 27/09/1939 35 days General
Boiler number AW13 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 11/03/1940 30/03/1940 20 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/06/1941 17/06/1941 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/11/1941 12/11/1941 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/09/1942 02/10/1942 32 days General
Boiler number HL105 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 14/12/1944 13/01/1945 31 days General
Boiler number 2437 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 05/04/1946 13/04/1946 9 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 16/01/1947 29/03/1947 73 days General
Boiler number 2566 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 17/05/1950 23/06/1950 38 days General
Boiler number 3847 (Diagram 50A)
Renumbered to BR 63445
 
Darlington Works 26/06/1950 12/07/1950 17 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 30/01/1953 28/02/1953 30 days General
Boiler number 24186 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 02/03/1953 03/03/1953 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 31/08/1955 24/09/1955 25 days General
Boiler number 24300 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 19/06/1957 20/06/1957 2 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 25/02/1958 03/04/1958 38 days General
Boiler number 24290 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 06/01/1960 08/01/1960 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/10/1961 27/10/1961 26 days General
Boiler number 24169 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 28/01/1965 28/01/1965 1 day Weighing  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2288
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 36
Allocated to Borough Gardens (BOR)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
09/10/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
08/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3445    
30/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
01/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
16/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H)    
13/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
19/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
26/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 63445 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev prev