|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 30/11/1923 | 28/02/1924 | 91 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1927 | 18/01/1928 | 302 days | General | Wheels to Doncaster for dynamic balance Boiler number D1616 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/07/1928 | 14/08/1928 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1931 | 27/03/1931 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1936 | 20/08/1936 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2556 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1939 | 22/02/1939 | 38 days | General | Boiler number D1492 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1940 | 08/06/1940 | 62 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1941 | 16/06/1941 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1942 | 09/04/1942 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3246 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1945 | 24/03/1945 | 57 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1945 | 05/04/1945 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/06/1946 | 26/06/1946 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1947 | 19/12/1947 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2692 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1947 | 06/01/1948 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/12/1948 | 14/01/1949 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 27/01/1949 | 02/02/1949 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/02/1949 | 07/04/1949 | 50 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1951 | 29/06/1951 | 37 days | General | Vacuum ejector fitted - Modification for iron ore train working Boiler number 24023 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 63460 |
||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1951 | 25/10/1951 | 13 days | Unclassified | Air reservoir added |
||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1954 | 15/05/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24027 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1954 | 30/10/1954 | 39 days | Light Casual | New cylinders |
||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1957 | 16/04/1957 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1957 | 09/11/1957 | 27 days | General | Westinghouse equipment removed Boiler number 24020 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1957 | 15/11/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1958 | 18/08/1958 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1960 | 28/01/1961 | 47 days | General | New firebox tubeplate & full set (150/24) of new tubes Boiler number 24022 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1962 | 15/06/1962 | 12 days | Unclassified | Complete AWS fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1962 | 12/10/1962 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1963 | 10/04/1963 | 1 day | No repairs | In for storage |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
30/06/1951 | Locomotives still not renumbered | Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). | SLS/195108 |
01/02/1964 | Branch line news (Works Yard) | Passenger services will be withdrawn from Hanley Loop (Etruria to Kidsgrove Liverpool Road) and Stoke to Silverdale branches from 2nd March, from the Aberdare-Abercynon and Cardiff Clarence Road branches from 16th March, from the Kemble to Cirencester, Kemble to Tetbury and Sheringham-Melton Constable branches from 6th April. The Waterside branch (from Old Dinting Goods GF, Mottram Yard) is to be closed completely on 2nd March. The Pinnox branch (Tunstall Junction to Longport Junction) was closed completely from 16th February, although the track is to be retained. From Pleasley Junction to 70 yards short of Messrs. Hollins coal siding (approx. 1 mile) is to be closed from 3rd March and the line thence to Pleasley East GF from 31st December, 1964. |
SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D25, D26, D30, D170, D177, D179, D3140, D3244, D3677, D5371, D7587 painted, D7589 nearly complete, D7590 motors mounted, D7591 motors mounted, D7592 shell, D7593 shell, D7594 shell, d12113, 47482, 60146, 60822, 61032, 61319, 62060, 63458, 65789, 90272, 90345. Weigh House: D22, D5107, 62001. Stripping Shop: 43987, 90483. Works Yard: D2700, D5113, D5148, D7588 painted, 42165, 43144, 60124, 60802, 62065, 63460, 65033, 65099, 68046, 73071, 73097, 75006, 75056. Crossing: D11, D3378. Scrap Yard: 42407, 47589, 60874, 68039, 68061, 90624. | SLS/196403 |
25/04/1964 | Darlington MPD (On Shed) | On Shed: 63460 Ex Works: 47482 Centrally located number on tank, 73097 green, 73144. | SLS/196406 |
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington MPD (Shed) | On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. | SLS/196410 |
24/10/1964 | Stratford Works (Old Erecting shop) | Old Erecting shop:, Locos. for preservation : LYR 1008, 30245/587/777/850/925, 33001, 49395, 71000, 63460, 63601 for preservation. (Note that GWR ones are still at Swindon.) | SLS/196411 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1919 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 901 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
30/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1923. Dep: 28/02/1924. | ||
23/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1927. Dep: 18/01/1928. Work undertaken: Wheels to Doncaster for dynamic balance Boiler number D1616 (Diagram 49) |
||
19/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
31/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/07/1928. Dep: 14/08/1928. | ||
10/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1931. Dep: 27/03/1931. | ||
05/05/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
08/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1936. Dep: 20/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2556 (Diagram 49) |
||
19/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
25/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
16/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1939. Dep: 22/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1492 (Diagram 49) |
||
08/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/04/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940. | ||
05/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/06/1941. Dep: 16/06/1941. | ||
06/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1942. Dep: 09/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3246 (Diagram 49A) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
27/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1945. Dep: 24/03/1945. | ||
04/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/04/1945. Dep: 05/04/1945. | ||
05/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/06/1946. Dep: 26/06/1946. | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3460 | ||
25/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1947. Dep: 19/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2692 (Diagram 49) |
||
29/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/12/1947. Dep: 06/01/1948. | ||
17/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/12/1948. Dep: 14/01/1949. | ||
27/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/01/1949. Dep: 02/02/1949. | ||
17/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/02/1949. Dep: 07/04/1949. | ||
24/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1951. Dep: 29/06/1951. Work undertaken: Vacuum ejector fitted - Modification for iron ore train working Boiler number 24023 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 63460 |
||
13/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/10/1951. Dep: 25/10/1951. Work undertaken: Air reservoir added |
||
14/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1954. Dep: 15/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24027 (Diagram 49A) |
||
22/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/09/1954. Dep: 30/10/1954. Work undertaken: New cylinders |
||
29/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/03/1957. Dep: 16/04/1957. | ||
14/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1957. Dep: 09/11/1957. Work undertaken: Westinghouse equipment removed Boiler number 24020 (Diagram 49A) |
||
11/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/11/1957. Dep: 15/11/1957. | ||
08/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/08/1958. Dep: 18/08/1958. | ||
13/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1960. Dep: 28/01/1961. Work undertaken: New firebox tubeplate & full set (150/24) of new tubes Boiler number 24022 (Diagram 49A) |
||
04/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/06/1962. Dep: 15/06/1962. Work undertaken: Complete AWS fitted |
||
02/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/10/1962. Dep: 12/10/1962. | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63460 from Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
10/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 10/04/1963. Dep: 10/04/1963. Work undertaken: In for storage |