Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 419 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6346 Week
» 5084 Month
» 419405 Year
» 1640970 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 904 m/e 11/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3463   24/11/1946
British Railways 63463 w/e 19/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q7
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q711/1919
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1919 to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Withdrawal Mon 03/12/1962 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Service Life 43 yrs, 1 mth , 2 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 5/3/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) m/e 11/1919
HAV Haverton Hill on 19/07/1928
SKN Stockton on 05/05/1931
DAR Darlington on 18/01/1936
TDK Tyne Dock on 28/03/1943
52G Sunderland on 14/06/1959
52H Tyne Dock on 13/12/1959
   Withdrawn on 03/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   on 03/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1919 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D980)
29/11/1927 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1221)
20/12/1935 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1665)
27/06/1939 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1513)
22/04/1942 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3269)
11/01/1947 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3052)
28/05/1958 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24019)
07/04/1962 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24104)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 20/11/1924 26/02/1925 99 days General  
Darlington Works 27/11/1925 13/04/1926 138 days Light Repair
Wheels to Doncaster for dynamic balancing
 
Darlington Works 10/08/1927 29/11/1927 112 days General
Boiler number D1221 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 29/10/1931 08/12/1931 41 days General  
Darlington Works 05/11/1935 20/12/1935 46 days General
Boiler number D1665 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 24/03/1937 24/03/1937 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 26/04/1937 28/05/1937 33 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 08/05/1939 27/06/1939 51 days General
Boiler number D1513 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 11/09/1939 15/09/1939 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 30/10/1939 30/10/1939 1 day Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/11/1939 14/11/1939 1 day Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/10/1940 04/11/1940 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 20/06/1941 27/06/1941 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 20/03/1942 22/04/1942 34 days General
Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 11/05/1942 01/07/1942 52 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 27/06/1944 02/08/1944 37 days General  
Darlington Works 02/12/1946 11/01/1947 41 days General
Boiler number 3052 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 28/01/1949 16/02/1949 20 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63463
 
Darlington Works 01/06/1950 01/07/1950 31 days General
Boiler number 24079 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 14/01/1952 01/03/1952 48 days Heavy Casual
Vacuum ejector fitted - Modification for iron ore train working
 
Gateshead Works 08/04/1953 13/05/1953 36 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 26/07/1954 04/09/1954 41 days General  
Darlington Works 06/09/1954 08/09/1954 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/09/1956 24/09/1956 11 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 13/12/1956 22/12/1956 10 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 26/04/1958 28/05/1958 33 days General
Westinghouse equipment removed
Boiler number 24019 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 29/09/1960 27/10/1960 29 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 28/02/1962 07/04/1962 39 days General
Complete AWS fitted
Boiler number 24104 (Diagram 49A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/03/1962 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1919 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 904
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
19/07/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV)    
05/05/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
18/01/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3463    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
13/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
03/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63463 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev prev