Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 40 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 40 Week
» 7652 Month
» 74514 Year
» 1739890 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 905 m/e 11/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3464   07/07/1946
British Railways 63464 w/e 31/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q7
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q711/1919
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1919 to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Withdrawal Mon 03/12/1962 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Service Life 43 yrs, 1 mth , 2 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 25/2/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
HLD   Hull Dairycoates (New) m/e 11/1919
HAV   Haverton Hill on 19/07/1928
SKN   Stockton on 05/05/1931
SEL   Selby on 13/08/1934
TDK   Tyne Dock on 28/03/1943
52C   Blaydon on 17/06/1956
52G   Sunderland on 25/01/1959
52H   Tyne Dock on 13/12/1959
     Withdrawn on 03/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   on 03/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
0000 Diagram 49 boiler fitted
11/1919 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D983)
20/08/1931 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1204)
18/01/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2783)
14/12/1939 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1588)
01/10/1942 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2558)
31/08/1946 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2265)
27/05/1950 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3424)
31/10/1953 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24000)
18/05/1957 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24051)
24/11/1960 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24042)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Darlington Works 15/03/1923 19/06/1923 97 days General    
Darlington Works 04/09/1925 18/12/1925 106 days General    
Gateshead Works 26/09/1928 12/11/1928 48 days General    
Darlington Works 29/10/1929 15/11/1929 18 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 17/06/1931 20/08/1931 65 days General Boiler number D1204 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 02/12/1935 18/01/1936 48 days General Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 19/01/1936 29/01/1936 11 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 18/08/1938 27/09/1938 41 days Heavy    
Darlington Works 08/11/1939 14/12/1939 37 days General Boiler number D1588 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 24/01/1941 24/02/1941 32 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 24/11/1941 11/12/1941 18 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 01/09/1942 01/10/1942 31 days General Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 03/01/1945 02/02/1945 31 days Light Repair    
Gateshead Works 17/05/1945 02/06/1945 17 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 18/07/1946 31/08/1946 45 days General Boiler number 2265 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 24/03/1947 05/07/1947 104 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 28/04/1950 27/05/1950 30 days General Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 63464
 
Darlington Works 08/06/1950 14/06/1950 7 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 06/10/1953 31/10/1953 26 days General Boiler number 24000 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 05/08/1954 14/08/1954 10 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 16/09/1954 07/10/1954 22 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 09/08/1956 16/08/1956 8 days Light Casual    
Darlington Works 24/04/1957 18/05/1957 25 days General Boiler number 24051 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 20/05/1957 21/05/1957 2 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 20/10/1960 24/11/1960 36 days General Boiler number 24042 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 17/01/1962 14/02/1962 29 days Heavy Casual Camplete AWS fitted
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/02/1962 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Modification Diagram 49 number D1577 boiler fitted    
11/1919 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 905
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
15/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1923. Dep: 19/06/1923.    
04/09/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1925. Dep: 18/12/1925.    
19/07/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV)    
26/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1928. Dep: 12/11/1928.    
29/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/10/1929. Dep: 15/11/1929.    
05/05/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
17/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1931. Dep: 20/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1204 (Diagram 49)
   
13/08/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
02/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49)
   
19/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/01/1936. Dep: 29/01/1936.    
18/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/08/1938. Dep: 27/09/1938.    
08/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1939. Dep: 14/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1588 (Diagram 49)
   
24/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1941. Dep: 24/02/1941.    
24/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/11/1941. Dep: 11/12/1941.    
01/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1942. Dep: 01/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
03/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1945. Dep: 02/02/1945.    
17/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/05/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945.    
07/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3464    
18/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2265 (Diagram 49)
   
24/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/03/1947. Dep: 05/07/1947.    
28/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1950. Dep: 27/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 63464
   
08/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/06/1950. Dep: 14/06/1950.    
06/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24000 (Diagram 49A)
   
05/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1954. Dep: 14/08/1954.    
16/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1954. Dep: 07/10/1954.    
17/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
09/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/08/1956. Dep: 16/08/1956.    
24/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1957. Dep: 18/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24051 (Diagram 49A)
   
20/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1957. Dep: 21/05/1957.    
25/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
13/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
20/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1960. Dep: 24/11/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24042 (Diagram 49A)
   
17/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/01/1962. Dep: 14/02/1962.
Work undertaken:
Camplete AWS fitted
   
03/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63464 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev prev