Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 85 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6012 Week
» 4750 Month
» 419071 Year
» 1640636 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 626 on 01/04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3467   17/11/1946
British Railways 63467 on 28/10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q7
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q701/04/1924
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 01/04/1924 to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Withdrawal Mon 26/11/1962 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Total Mileage 683,154
Service Life 38 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 5/4/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 01/04/1924
SKN Stockton on 19/07/1928
SEL Selby on 27/11/1930
WHL West Hartlepool on 06/09/1941
NPT Newport (Teeside) on 03/09/1942
DAR Darlington on 14/09/1942
TDK Tyne Dock on 28/03/1943
54A Sunderland on 23/09/1956
52H Tyne Dock on 20/08/1961
   Withdrawn on 26/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 4w/e 09/09/1961
WDN   on 26/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/04/1924 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1616)
25/05/1927 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1665)
29/11/1935 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2267)
04/04/1939 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1595)
30/04/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1619)
08/07/1944 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2692)
28/11/1947 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2557)
28/10/1950 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24004)
10/07/1953 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24011)
20/02/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24076)
02/06/1959 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24103)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 07/02/1927 25/05/1927 108 days General
Boiler number D1665 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 18/07/1930 29/08/1930 43 days General  
Darlington Works 16/10/1935 29/11/1935 45 days General
Boiler number 2267 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 09/12/1937 10/02/1938 64 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 21/02/1939 04/04/1939 43 days General
Boiler number D1595 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 26/03/1941 30/04/1941 36 days General
Boiler number D1619 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 15/06/1944 08/07/1944 24 days General
Boiler number 2692 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 05/07/1945 18/08/1945 45 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 30/04/1946 18/05/1946 19 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 29/10/1947 28/11/1947 31 days General
Boiler number 2557 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 04/10/1950 28/10/1950 25 days General
Boiler number 24004 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR 63467
 
Darlington Works 30/10/1950 03/11/1950 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 12/06/1953 10/07/1953 29 days General
Boiler number 24011 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 04/03/1955 31/03/1955 28 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 23/01/1956 20/02/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 24076 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 04/05/1959 02/06/1959 30 days General
Boiler number 24103 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 11/06/1959 26/06/1959 16 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/07/1959 09/07/1959 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 27/07/1959 18/08/1959 23 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 18/12/1961 17/01/1962 31 days Light Casual
Complete AWS fitted
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/01/1962 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/04/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 626
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
19/07/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
27/11/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
06/09/1941 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
03/09/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
14/09/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3467    
23/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
20/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
26/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63467 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev prev