Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 638 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5109 Week
» 16155 Month
» 16155 Year
» 1681531 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 630 on 16/04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3470   17/11/1946
British Railways 63470 w/e 08/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q7
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q716/04/1924
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 16/04/1924 to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Withdrawal Mon 03/12/1962 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Total Mileage 938,671
Service Life 38 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 15/3/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 16/04/1924
SKN Stockton on 24/05/1928
SEL Selby on 27/11/1930
TDK Tyne Dock on 28/03/1943
52C Blaydon on 17/06/1956
54B Tyne Dock on 08/06/1958
   Withdrawn on 03/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   on 03/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
16/04/1924 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1623)
20/08/1929 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2263)
10/10/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1243)
28/10/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1513)
30/06/1939 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1573)
06/09/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2775)
30/08/1944 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2778)
16/08/1947 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2718)
23/01/1953 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24062)
12/11/1955 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24103)
13/02/1959 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24035)
23/02/1962 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24059)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 02/07/1926 26/10/1926 117 days General  
Darlington Works 17/06/1929 20/08/1929 65 days General
Boiler number 2263 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 01/09/1933 10/10/1933 40 days General
Boiler number D1243 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 03/01/1936 07/02/1936 36 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 15/09/1936 28/10/1936 44 days General
Boiler number D1513 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 04/05/1939 30/06/1939 58 days General
Boiler number D1573 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 05/08/1941 06/09/1941 33 days General
Boiler number 2775 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 02/08/1944 30/08/1944 29 days General
Boiler number 2778 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 13/02/1946 28/02/1946 16 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 27/06/1947 16/08/1947 51 days General
Boiler number 2718 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 05/01/1950 05/04/1950 91 days General
Boiler number 24060 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR 63470
 
Gateshead Works 29/04/1952 22/05/1952 24 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 23/12/1952 23/01/1953 32 days General
Boiler number 24062 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 07/10/1954 08/10/1954 2 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 18/10/1955 12/11/1955 26 days General
Boiler number 24103 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 14/11/1955 15/11/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 10/01/1958 17/01/1958 8 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 12/01/1959 13/02/1959 33 days General
Boiler number 24035 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 10/02/1961 07/03/1961 26 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 22/01/1962 23/02/1962 33 days General
Complete AWS fitted
Boiler number 24059 (Diagram 49A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/02/1962 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/04/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 630
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
24/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
27/11/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3470    
17/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
08/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
03/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63470 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev prev