Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 402 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 402 Week
» 27023 Month
» 27023 Year
» 1692399 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 632 on 30/04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3472   24/11/1946
British Railways 63472 on 20/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q7
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q730/04/1924
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 30/04/1924 to Tyne Dock (TDK)
Withdrawal Mon 03/12/1962 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Total Mileage 600,905
Service Life 38 yrs, 7 mths , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 18/4/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
TDK Tyne Dock (New) on 30/04/1924
AFP Annfield Plain m/e 01/1927
TDK Tyne Dock on 14/10/1929
52C Blaydon on 17/06/1956
52H Tyne Dock on 08/03/1959
   Withdrawn on 03/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   on 03/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
30/04/1924 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1631)
05/05/1934 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1133)
15/12/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1633)
19/02/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1551)
09/12/1943 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3424)
20/04/1950 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2718)
28/02/1953 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24076)
04/01/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24013)
15/12/1959 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24085)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 24/12/1925 05/02/1926 44 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 24/09/1928 08/11/1928 46 days General  
Darlington Works 05/04/1934 05/05/1934 31 days General
Boiler number D1133 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 01/11/1937 15/12/1937 45 days General
Boiler number D1633 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 06/06/1940 13/06/1940 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/12/1940 19/02/1941 58 days General
Boiler number D1551 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 26/08/1943 09/12/1943 106 days General
Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 10/08/1946 07/09/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 24079 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 15/11/1947 05/12/1947 21 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 08/03/1950 20/04/1950 44 days General
Boiler number 2718 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR 63472
 
Gateshead Works 14/02/1951 05/04/1951 51 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 02/02/1953 28/02/1953 27 days General
Boiler number 24076 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 02/03/1953 03/03/1953 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/12/1955 04/01/1956 31 days General
Boiler number 24013 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 11/09/1956 25/09/1956 15 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 30/05/1957 06/06/1957 8 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 27/10/1959 15/12/1959 50 days General
Boiler number 24085 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 09/02/1961 17/03/1961 37 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 23/01/1962 28/02/1962 37 days Light Casual
Complete AWS fitted
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/02/1962 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/04/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 632
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
01/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Annfield Plain (AFP)    
14/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3472    
17/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
08/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
03/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63472 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev prev