Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 387 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6314 Week
» 5052 Month
» 419373 Year
» 1640938 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 633 on 03/05/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3473   24/11/1946
British Railways 63473 w/e 10/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q7
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q703/05/1924
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 03/05/1924 to Tyne Dock (TDK)
Withdrawal Mon 17/12/1962 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Total Mileage 701,441
Service Life 38 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 10/4/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
TDK Tyne Dock (New) on 03/05/1924
BOR Borough Gardens m/e 1930
GHD Gateshead on 29/05/1933
YK York (North) (on loan) on 03/04/1935
YK York (North) on 19/03/1937
TDK Tyne Dock on 28/03/1943
52G Sunderland on 21/06/1959
52H Tyne Dock on 13/12/1959
   Withdrawn on 17/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   on 17/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/05/1924 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1633)
22/04/1931 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1628)
18/07/1934 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1619)
12/08/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1201)
30/01/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1465)
22/03/1946 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2556)
10/09/1949 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2879)
05/04/1952 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24046)
27/11/1954 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24101)
07/12/1957 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24107)
01/06/1962 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24034)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 12/05/1927 04/08/1927 85 days General  
Gateshead Works 13/03/1931 22/04/1931 41 days General
Boiler number D1628 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 18/06/1934 18/07/1934 31 days General
Boiler number D1619 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 25/06/1937 12/08/1937 49 days General
Boiler number D1201 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 13/08/1937 13/08/1937 1 day Unclassified  
Darlington Works 28/12/1939 30/01/1940 34 days General
Boiler number D1465 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 02/02/1943 06/03/1943 33 days General
Boiler number 24079 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 16/11/1944 30/12/1944 45 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 23/02/1946 22/03/1946 28 days General
Boiler number 2556 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 31/08/1947 24/09/1947 25 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 10/08/1949 10/09/1949 32 days General
Boiler number 2879 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR 63473
 
Darlington Works 28/09/1949 12/10/1949 15 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 12/10/1949 20/10/1949 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/03/1952 05/04/1952 30 days General
Vacuum ejector fitted - Modification for iron ore train working
Boiler number 24046 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 26/10/1954 27/11/1954 33 days General
Boiler number 24101 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 29/11/1954 02/12/1954 4 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 20/02/1956 05/04/1956 46 days Light Casual  
Gateshead Works 07/09/1956 26/09/1956 20 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 12/11/1957 07/12/1957 26 days Unclassified
Westinghouse equipment removed
Boiler number 24107 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 09/12/1957 11/12/1957 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/06/1960 30/08/1960 85 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 25/04/1962 01/06/1962 38 days General
Complete AWS fitted
Boiler number 24034 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 14/06/1962 21/06/1962 8 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/05/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 633
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
1930 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR)    
29/05/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
03/04/1935 Allocation Loaned to York (North) (YK)    
19/03/1937 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3473    
21/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
13/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
17/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63473 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev prev