Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 887 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4590 Week
» 3328 Month
» 417649 Year
» 1639214 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Hull & Barnsley Railway 118 m/e 03/1907
North Eastern Railway 3118 y/e 1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2499   07/04/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Stirling
Class Q10
Company History HBR/LNER/BR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q10/103/1907
Q10/213/03/1928
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Works Number 900
To Service During 03/1907 to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Withdrawal Thu 06/08/1931 off Selby (SEL)
Service Life 24 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLS Hull Springhead (New) m/e 03/1907
SEL Selby on 18/11/1929
MEX Mexborough on 02/01/1931
SEL Selby on 31/07/1931
   Withdrawn on 06/08/1931

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1907 Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_118)
13/03/1928 Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D1994)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 18/09/1925 19/02/1926 155 days General  
Darlington Works 17/12/1927 13/03/1928 88 days General
Boiler number D1994 (Diagram Q10domed)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1907 To Service To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 118
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 900
Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted
   
1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 3118    
07/04/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 2499    
18/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
02/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
31/07/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
06/08/1931 Withdrawn Condemned as 2499 from Selby (SEL)    

prev prev