Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 884 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4587 Week
» 3325 Month
» 417646 Year
» 1639211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Hull & Barnsley Railway 119 m/e 03/1907
North Eastern Railway 3119 y/e 1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2500   07/07/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Stirling
Class Q10
Company History HBR/LNER/BR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q10/103/1907
Q10/220/06/1927
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Works Number 901
To Service During 03/1907 to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Withdrawal Sat 02/05/1931 off Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Service Life 24 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLS Hull Springhead (New) m/e 03/1907
CUD Cudworth on 01/07/1924
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 23/10/1929
MEX Mexborough on 01/01/1931
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 27/04/1931
   Withdrawn on 02/05/1931

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1907 Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_119)
20/06/1927 Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D1817)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 23/03/1923 23/06/1923 93 days General  
Darlington Works 31/03/1927 20/06/1927 82 days General
Boiler number D1817 (Diagram Q10domed)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1907 To Service To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 119
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 901
Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted
   
1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 3119    
01/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD)    
07/07/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 2500    
23/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
01/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
27/04/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
02/05/1931 Withdrawn Condemned as 2500 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    

prev prev