Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2960 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16366 Week
» 69382 Month
» 188909 Year
» 3215762 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Hull & Barnsley Railway |
120 |
m/e |
03/1907 |
North Eastern Railway |
3120 |
y/e |
1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2501 |
|
16/06/1924 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Darlington |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1907 |
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_120) |
21/03/1928 |
Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D1997) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
|
|
11/1921 |
11/1921 |
|
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
23/03/1923 |
23/06/1923 |
93 days |
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
27/10/1925 |
19/02/1926 |
116 days |
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
10/12/1927 |
21/03/1928 |
103 days |
General |
Boiler number D1997 (Diagram Q10domed)
|
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/08/1949 |
Stratford Works |
On 20/8 the Repair Shop contained the following: Nos. 1542, 2501/07/90, 64667/91, 65440, 5551, 8317, 8576, 8654, 9633, 69653, 9685. The last M. & G.N. 'J.93' tank-No. 8489-is in Stratford Yard. Stratford still paints 'British Railways' on tanks and tenders which do not carry the crest. |
SLS/194909 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 120 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 902 Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) Diagram Q10 boiler fitted |
|
|
1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3120 |
|
|
23/03/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1923. Dep: 23/06/1923. |
|
|
16/06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2501 |
|
|
27/10/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1925. Dep: 19/02/1926. |
|
|
27/05/1927 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
10/12/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1927. Dep: 21/03/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1997 (Diagram Q10domed)
|
|
|
22/10/1928 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) |
|
|
06/07/1929 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
01/01/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) |
|
|
06/08/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
13/08/1931 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2501 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|