Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 868 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4571 Week
» 3309 Month
» 417630 Year
» 1639195 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Hull & Barnsley Railway 121 m/e 08/1907
North Eastern Railway 3121 y/e 1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2502   04/06/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Stirling
Class Q10
Company History HBR/LNER/BR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q10/108/1907
Q10/226/04/1926
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Works Number 903
To Service During 08/1907 to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Withdrawal Wed 04/11/1931 off Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Service Life 24 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLS Hull Springhead (New) m/e 08/1907
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 27/05/1927
HLS Hull Springhead on 22/10/1928
MEX Mexborough on 02/01/1931
MAR March on 15/07/1931
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 24/10/1931
   Withdrawn on 04/11/1931

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1907 Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_121)
26/04/1926 Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D1805)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 07/06/1922 03/11/1922 150 days General  
Darlington Works 21/04/1926 26/04/1926 6 days General
Boiler number D1805 (Diagram Q10domed)
 
Darlington Works 18/03/1930 28/05/1930 72 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1907 To Service To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 121
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 903
Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted
   
1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 3121    
04/06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 2502    
27/05/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
22/10/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
02/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
15/07/1931 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
24/10/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
04/11/1931 Withdrawn Condemned as 2502 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    

prev prev